POB, LP v. AMCO Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: POB, LP doing business as Pat O'Brien's San Antonio
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Alec Niemeyer, AMCO Insurance Company and William Randall Wade
Case Number: 5:2020cv00836
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 Remand Letter to the 73rd District Court, Bexar Co., with Certified Copies of Order of Remand & Docket Sheet. (wg)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REMAND BACK TO STATE COURT re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by POB, LP,. It is hereby Ordered that this case is remandedpursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), (d) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kemp, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff POB, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by POB, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Duarte, Demetrio)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, re #9 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Amended Pleading with Incorporated Memorandum filed by Plaintiff POB, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. This case is stayed until the Court rules on Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Joinder in Defendants' Notice of Removal by William Randall Wade re #1 Notice of Removal, (Culpepper, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Case by POB, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Expedited Hearing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Duarte, Demetrio)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Amended Pleading with Incorporated Memorandum by POB, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Expedited hearing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)(Duarte, Demetrio)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court File and Docket Sheet)(Kemp, Patrick)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Kemp, Patrick)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan D. Carlyle on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company (Carlyle, Ethan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Glen Wall on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company (Wall, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
July 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13772051), filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supp Cover Sheet, #5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure - AMCO, #6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure - Nationwide)(Kemp, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POB, LP v. AMCO Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Kemp
Represented By: Ethan D. Carlyle
Represented By: Robert Glen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Niemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Kemp
Represented By: Ethan D. Carlyle
Represented By: Robert Glen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Randall Wade
Represented By: Thomas A. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POB, LP doing business as Pat O'Brien's San Antonio
Represented By: Demetrio Duarte, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?