Securities and Exchange Commission v. Farias et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Integrity Aviation & Leasing, LLC and Victor Lee Farias
Case Number: 5:2020cv00885
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Second Agreement to Extend Answer Date by Securities and Exchange Commission, Integrity Aviation & Leasing, LLC., and Victor Lee Farias (Frank, Janie) Modified on 9/15/2020 To edit text (bc).
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Agreement to Extend Answer Date by Securities and Exchange Commission (Frank, Janie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Integrity Aviation & Leasing, LLC served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Frank, Janie)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Victor Lee Farias served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Frank, Janie)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Victor Lee Farias, Integrity Aviation & Leasing, LLC. (bc)
July 30, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
July 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Frank, Janie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Frank, Janie)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frank, Janie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Farias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Aviation & Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Lee Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Janie L. Frank
Represented By: Rebecca R. Fike
Represented By: B. David Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?