RRNB 1290 LLC v. Security State Bank & Trust
Defendant: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, San Antonio
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellee: Security State Bank & Trust
Appellant: RRNB 1290 LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00933
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Transmission of Record on Appeal to District Court - Appellant's Supplemental Designation of the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Transcript from 7/27/2020 Hearing, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/19/2020 (rg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Transmission of Record on Appeal to District Court. The Appellees designation of additional items to be included in the record on appeal is complete. Exhibits, in paper format, from the June 29, 2020 hearing will be hand delivered to the District Court Clerks office contemporaneously herewith.(Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation, #2 Transcript - 6/29/2020 Hearing, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Transmission of Record on Appeal to District Court. The Appellant's Record on Appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Appellant's Designations, #3 Transcript 6/29/2020 Hearing, #4 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam)
August 11, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Order being Appealed, #2 Docket Report, #3 List of Parties, #4 LtrTrnNtcDCBK) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RRNB 1290 LLC v. Security State Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk, San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Security State Bank & Trust
Represented By: Robert L. Barrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RRNB 1290 LLC
Represented By: Morris E. (Trey) White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?