Flores v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Plaintiff: Bernabe Flores
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee and U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Case Number: 5:2020cv00962
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/7/2021 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2021 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 2/8/2021, ADR Mediation Completed by 4/7/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2021, Discovery due by 5/10/2021, Motions due by 5/24/2021,. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Scheduling Order by U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Anderson, Richard)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Consent/Non Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Anderson, Richard)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AND ADVISORY -It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
August 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13869449), filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exh 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Exh 2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 Copy of St Court Filings)(Anderson, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernabe Flores
Represented By: Gregory T. Van Cleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Represented By: Richard E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Richard E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?