TitanUrbi21, LLC et al v. GS Oilfield Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TitanUrbi21, LLC, DALF Energy, LLC and Titan Vac & Flow, LLC
Defendant: Scott Miller, Jean Arnold Martindale, TY Com Inc, Suoco Oil Company, HAN Operating Inc, Viki Teinart, Sanabi Oil Company, Caddo Creek Energy Inc, Jeffery Charles Scribner, Russell Martindale, JMR Gas LLC, Trofa Operating LLC, GS Oilfield Services LLC, Prairie Infrastructure Solutions LLC, Inetha Anderson, Steve Teinart, Oil & Gas Holdings LLC, Prairie Oil Company, Hector Fino, Youngblood-Charles-Viki-Christi LP, Mary Martindale, HY Tech Inc, Jona Daniels Smith, Michael Ferguson, Patricia Peterson, Youngblood Resources Inc, Barry D Peterson, BMJ Energy Inc, Pantex Oil & Gas LLC, Marilyn Crafton, Jeffery R Scribner and Daniels Family Energy LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv01010
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: San Antonio Office
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER AND REFERRAL TO UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, SAN ANTONIO DIVISION--IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the above-styled and numbered cause is TRANSFERRED and REFERRED to United States Bankruptcy Judge Craig A. Gargotta as related to the bankruptcy proceeding in In re DALF Energy, LLC, 20-50369-CAG. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon transfer of this case to the Bankruptcy Court the Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by GS Oilfield Services LLC, Oil & Gas Holdings LLC, Jeffery R Scribner, Jeffery Charles Scribner, Trofa Operating LLC. (Williamson, Allen)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
August 27, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
August 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 2:20-cv-00069.
August 27, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Aug 27 14:37:40 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Court hereby ORDERS this case TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division. 28 U.S.C. 124(d)(4). It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Application for Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 4) is DENIED both as moot and for lacking local counsel. N.D. TEX. CIV. R. 83.10(a). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.) (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 8/27/2020) (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Patricia Peterson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David M Russell added to party Patricia Peterson(pty:dft) (Russell, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by DALF Energy, LLC, Titan Vac & Flow, LLC, TitanUrbi21, LLC re #5 Response/Objection (Hervol, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by DALF Energy, LLC, Titan Vac & Flow, LLC, TitanUrbi21, LLC re: #3 MOTION to Remand (Hervol, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10811393) filed by DALF Energy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Henry Anthony Hervol added to party DALF Energy, LLC(pty:pla) (Hervol, Henry) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Prairie Oil Company, JMR Gas LLC, Jean Arnold Martindale, Russell Martindale, Sanabi Oil Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Isern, Kevin) Added filers on 4/16/2020 (daa). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from In the District Court, 223rd Judicial District, Gray County, Texas, case number 38930 filed by DALF Energy, LLC, TitanUrbi21, LLC, Titan Vac & Flow, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10711635) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 A-1, #5 A-2, #6 A-3, #7 A-4, #8 A-5, #9 A-6, #10 A-7, #11 A-8, #12 A-9, #13 A-10, #14 A-11, #15 A-12, #16 A-13, #17 A-14, #18 A-15, #19 A-16, #20 A-17, #21 A-18, #22 A-19, #23 A-20, #24 A-21, #25 A-22, #26 A-23, #27 A-24, #28 A-25, #29 A-26, #30 A-27, #31 A-28, #32 A-29, #33 A-30, #34 A-31, #35 A-32, #36 A-33, #37 A-34, #38 A-35, #39 A-36, #40 A-37, #41 A-38, #42 A-39, #43 A-40, #44 A-41, #45 A-42, #46 A-43, #47 A-44, #48 A-45, #49 A-46, #50 A-47, #51 A-48, #52 A-49, #53 A-50, #54 Exhibit(s) B, #55 Exhibit(s) C) (Driver, Vickie) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TitanUrbi21, LLC et al v. GS Oilfield Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TitanUrbi21, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B. Payne
Represented By: Vickie L. Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALF Energy, LLC
Represented By: H. Anthony Hervol
Represented By: Christopher B. Payne
Represented By: Vickie L. Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titan Vac & Flow, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B. Payne
Represented By: Vickie L. Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Miller
Represented By: Steven Robert Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Arnold Martindale
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TY Com Inc
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suoco Oil Company
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAN Operating Inc
Represented By: Don M Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viki Teinart
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanabi Oil Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Creek Energy Inc
Represented By: Steven Robert Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Charles Scribner
Represented By: Allen L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Martindale
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMR Gas LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trofa Operating LLC
Represented By: Allen L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Allen L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Infrastructure Solutions LLC
Represented By: Steven Robert Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inetha Anderson
Represented By: Don M Connally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Teinart
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oil & Gas Holdings LLC
Represented By: Allen L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Oil Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Fino
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youngblood-Charles-Viki-Christi LP
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Martindale
Represented By: Kevin A. Isern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HY Tech Inc
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jona Daniels Smith
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferguson
Represented By: Steven Robert Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Peterson
Represented By: David M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youngblood Resources Inc
Represented By: John Charles Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry D Peterson
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMJ Energy Inc
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantex Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Steven Robert Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Crafton
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery R Scribner
Represented By: Allen L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels Family Energy LP
Represented By: Barry D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?