Whitlock v. Lowe
Appellant: Cheri Ann Whitlock
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Case Number: 5:2020cv01011
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 10/26/2020, (mgr)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Cheri Ann Whitlock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greer, Dean)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Transmission of Record on Appeal to District Court. The Appellees Record on Appeal is complete. Civil Action Number: 20-cv-1011 (Attachments: #1 Appellees Designation, #2 Appellees Designations Excluding ECF No. 33, #3 Appellees Designation ECF No. 33, #4 Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Transmission of Record on Appeal to District Court. The Appellant's Record on Appeal is complete. Civil Action Number: 20-cv-1011 (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Appellant's Designations, #3 Appellant's Designation - Transcript of Hearing 4-23-2020, #4 Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Patrick Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Dismissing Appeal)(McGowan, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
August 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Notification sent to TXW BK Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Order being Appealed, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 List of Parties, #4 LtrTrnNtcDCAP) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock v. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cheri Ann Whitlock
Represented By: Dean William Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Patrick Lowe
Represented By: Elliott S. Cappuccio
Represented By: Matthew J. McGowan
Represented By: Leslie Sara Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?