Hector Rivas vs. PPG Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hector Rivas
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc,
Case Number: 5:2020cv01114
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: InitialPretrial Conference held on 11/13/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ftr gold.)(rg)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/11/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021, Discovery due by 5/13/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2021. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order Pursuant to Rule 502(d) by PPG Industries, Inc,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Thomas, Ashley)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Hector Rivas. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 Scheduling Recommendations by PPG Industries, Inc,. (Thomas, Ashley)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by PPG Industries, Inc,. (Thomas, Ashley) Modified on 11/9/2020 (rg).
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by PPG Industries, Inc,. (Thomas, Ashley)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ( Scheduling Recommendations due by 11/12/2020 and Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PPG Industries, Inc,. (Thomas, Ashley)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Nehal Shah Anand added to party PPG Industries, Inc,(pty:dft) by PPG Industries, Inc,.(Anand, Nehal)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hector Rivas. PPG Industries, Inc, served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/12/2020. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for disposition of all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PPG Industries, Inc,. (cd)
September 18, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (cd)
September 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HECTOR RIVAS. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13981167), filed by HECTOR RIVAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bourgeacq, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector Rivas vs. PPG Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc,
Represented By: Nehal Shah Anand
Represented By: Ashley Danielle Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Rivas
Represented By: Christian A. Bourgeacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?