Douglas K. Smith v. Eric Terry
Appellant: Douglas K. Smith and Douglas K. Smith, MD
Appellee: Eric Terry
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
In Re: Salubrio, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01194
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Order by the Bankruptcy Court Regarding the Clerk's Record on Appeal by Eric Terry re #12 Attachment, #8 Transmission of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Segura, Misty)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT to #10 Attachment, #8 Transmission of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The Appellant's second amended designation of the record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Transcripts) (Lawson, Rob)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eric Terry, re #4 MOTION to Stay Bankruptcy Order Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Douglas K. Smith, MD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Segura, Misty)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT to #8 Transmission of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal, Appellant's Statement of the Issues on Appeal. (Lawson, Rob)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellee's designation of additional items to include in the record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Individual Designations) (Lawson, Rob)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. The Appellant's designated record on appeal is complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Amended Designation of the Record on Appeal, #2 Individual Designations, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SUBSTANTIVE RESPONSE - Appellee Eric Terry, Chapter 7 Trustee, is ORDERED to respond, if at all, to the substantive arguments in Appellants Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (Dkt. #4) by Friday, November 20, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eric Terry, re #4 MOTION to Stay Bankruptcy Order Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Douglas K. Smith, MD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Page 31 of the September 28, 2020 Hearing Transcript)(Segura, Misty)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Appellee Eric Terry respond as to the urgency of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal no later than Thursday, November 5, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rg)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Bankruptcy Order Pending Appeal by Douglas K. Smith, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Clouthier, Susan)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan J. Clouthier on behalf of Douglas K. Smith, MD. Attorney Susan J. Clouthier added to party Douglas K. Smith, MD(pty:a) (Clouthier, Susan)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Misty Ann Segura on behalf of Eric Terry. Attorney Misty Ann Segura added to party Eric Terry(pty:e) (Segura, Misty)
October 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
October 7, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Notification sent to TXW BK Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Being Appealed, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 List of Parties) (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas K. Smith v. Eric Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Douglas K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Douglas K. Smith, MD
Represented By: Susan J. Clouthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric Terry
Represented By: Eric M. Van Horn
Represented By: Misty Ann Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Salubrio, LLC
Represented By: Martin Warren Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?