Esei v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Aaron Esei
Respondent: Daniel Bible, Reynaldo Castro and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv01360
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all costs and attorneys fees shall be paid by the party incurring them. This Courts referral of this action to Magistrate Judge Chestney is withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by Aaron Esei. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtright, Lance)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 Sealed Document (Exhibits to #7 ) filed (bc)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. The Clerk of Court is directed to file and maintain Respondents Exhibits to their Response and Motion for Summary Judgment [#8-2 to #8-8] under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Ex. A, #3 Sealed Document Ex. B, #4 Sealed Document Ex. C, #5 Sealed Document Ex. D, #6 Sealed Document Ex. E, #7 Sealed Document Ex. F, #8 Sealed Document Ex. G) (Lowry, Faith)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment Respondents' Response and Motion for Summary Judgment by Daniel Bible, Reynaldo Castro, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Errata F, #7 Exhibit G)(Lowry, Faith)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt- Green Card Return for Reynaldo Castro of #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bc)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt-Green Card Return for: U.S. Attorney's Office of #3 Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Mailing of #3 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to U.S. Attorney's Office and Reynaldo Castro (bc)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER-- IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Respondents file a response to the Petition within 30 days from the date of service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk shall furnish the Office of the United States Attorney in San Antonio, Texas, and Respondent Castro with copies of the Petition and this Order, and that such delivery by certified mail return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
November 24, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
November 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0542-14220403), filed by Aaron Esei. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Casa Marianella docs, #3 Exhibit Congressman Doggett's letter, #4 Exhibit ICE decision, #5 Exhibit Alert from U.S. Embassy)(Curtright, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esei v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Reynaldo Castro
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Esei
Represented By: Lance Edward Curtright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?