Luevano v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Luevano
Defendant: U.S. Judge O. Garcia, U.S. Judge Lee Yeakel and U.S. Judges
Case Number: 5:2020cv01390
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Remark: Letter/correspondence from Mr. Luevano.***Per 5th Circuit's instructions, letter/correspondence will not be allowed to be filed as a NOA.*** (dtg)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE pursuant to the sanction order in Luevano v. Office of Inspector General, No. SA-11-CV-131-OLG (W.D. Tex. 2011), which sanctioned Plaintiff $100 and barred him from filing documents with the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas until the sanction is paid. The docket record for that proceeding does not indicate Plaintiff has satisfied his sanction. Accordingly, Plaintiff is not authorized to file a new action. Forthcoming submissions other than proof of satisfaction of sanctions will be neither addressed nor acknowledged pursuant to the Order signed by Chief Judge Garcia. The Order signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia barring Plaintiff is attached. Case administratively closed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc) Modified on 12/16/2020 To edit text (bc).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jaime Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(dtg)
December 4, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (dtg)
December 4, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luevano v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Luevano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Judge O. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Judge Lee Yeakel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Judges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?