Raymond v. Flagstar Bank et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Raymond
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engle, LLP, James C. Frappier, M. Samuel Daffin, II, Mary A. Daffin, Brian S. Engel, Flagstar Bank, Robert F. Frappier and Steve Turner
Case Number: 5:2020cv01439
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION For Justice to be Served Under the Law by Carlos Antonio Raymond. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Mailing Receipt to Carlos Antonio Raymond of #8 Report and Recommendations (bc)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Henry J. Bemporad for all proceedings. Judge Richard B. Farrer no longer assigned to case. DENIED #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Motion to Stay filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S #1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR REDRESS by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bc)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engle, LLP, M. Samuel Daffin, II, Mary A. Daffin, Brian S. Engel, Flagstar Bank, James C. Frappier, Robert F. Frappier, and Steve Turner. (bc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case Opening Letter to Carlos Antonio Raymond.(nm)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay (Delay) Forceful Detainer (Eviction) by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (nm)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (nm)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 500056368), filed by Carlos Antonio Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Receipt)(nm)
December 18, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (nm)
December 18, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond v. Flagstar Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner Engle, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Frappier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Samuel Daffin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Daffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Frappier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?