Davis et al v. Doucet et al
Plaintiff: Steven A Davis, M.D., P,A. Steven A Davis and Steven A. Davis, M.D., P.A.
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association and Patricia Doucet
Case Number: 5:2021cv00149
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Catalano, Frank)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Substituted Service. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Service for Defendant Patricia Doucet by Steven A Davis, Steven A. Davis, M.D., P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Cedillo, Ricardo)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association . (Catalano, Frank)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association.(Catalano, Frank)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Amended NOTICE of Removal by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Catalano, Frank)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Letter sent to attorney: Garrett W. Peery regarding admission into the Western District of Texas(bc)
February 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
February 16, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Catalano, Frank)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14489811), filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Catalano, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Doucet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A Davis
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D., P,A. Steven A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A. Davis, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: Ricardo G. Cedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Frank J. Catalano
Represented By: Gregg D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Doucet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?