United States of America v. Marlin Medical Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dr. Richard Niemeyer, VC Pharmacy d/b/a Rite Care Pharmacy IV, Dr. Latisha Rowe, Shapa Inc. d/b/a Rite Care Pharmacy, Medscript Pharmacy LLC, Marlin Medical Solutions LLC, Dr. Alex De Jesus, David Marlin Edwards, VC Pharmacy doing business as Rite Care Pharmacy IV and Shapa Inc. doing business as Rite Care Pharmacy
Case Number: 5:2021cv00160
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Medscript Pharmacy LLC answer due 6/22/2021. (bc)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Medscript Pharmacy LLC shall answer the Complaint 60 days from April 23, 2021, which shall be June 22, 2021 entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marlin Medical Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Extend Time)(Howard, Bradley)
April 19, 2021 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE TITLE OF THE ENTRY AND TO UPDATE THE SERVICE AND ANSWER DUE DATE.*** re #10 Certificate of Service. (bc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Latisha Rowe served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin) Modified on 4/19/2021 To edit text (bc).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Agreed Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Robert L. Seibert and Keene & Seibert, P.C. are hereby allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Shapa Inc. d/b/a Rite CarePharmacy and VC Pharmacy d/b/a Rite Care Pharmacy IV, and Erica Giese and Josu Galvan of the law firm of Jackson Walker LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Defendants entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Shapa Inc., VC Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Substitute Counsel)(Giese, Erica)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Shapa Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021; VC Pharmacy. Waiver sent on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Richard Niemeyer. Waiver sent on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to David Marlin Edwards. Waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021; Marlin Medical Solutions LLC. Waiver sent on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Medscript Pharmacy LLC. Waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex De Jesus, David Marlin Edwards, Marlin Medical Solutions LLC, Medscript Pharmacy LLC, Richard Niemeyer, Latisha Rowe, Shapa Inc., and VC Pharmacy. (bc)
February 22, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
February 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Van De Walle, Erin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons, #6 Supplement Summons)(Van De Walle, Erin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT U.S. v. Marlin Medical Solutions LLC et al (Filing fee $ 402.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van De Walle, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Marlin Medical Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Niemeyer
Represented By: R. Chad Geisler
Represented By: James Byron Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VC Pharmacy d/b/a Rite Care Pharmacy IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Latisha Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapa Inc. d/b/a Rite Care Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medscript Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Bradley W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Medical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alex De Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marlin Edwards
Represented By: Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VC Pharmacy doing business as Rite Care Pharmacy IV
Represented By: Josue Joel Galvan
Represented By: Robert L. Seibert
Represented By: Erica Benites Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapa Inc. doing business as Rite Care Pharmacy
Represented By: Josue Joel Galvan
Represented By: Robert L. Seibert
Represented By: Erica Benites Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin M. Van De Walle
Represented By: Samuel M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?