Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio v. HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio
Defendant: Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Bexar Management and Development Corporation, 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Medio Springs, LP, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Hogan Properties Company, Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation, Medio Living GP, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC and Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP
Case Number: 5:2021cv00238
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Bexar Management and Development Corporation Mark Anthony Sanchez Vacation Letter. (Sanchez, Mark)
May 7, 2021 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Medio Living GP, LLC, Defendant Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Defendant Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Defendant San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation, Defendant Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Defendant Bexar Management and Development Corporation, Defendant Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Defendant Commonwealth Housing Corporation (Response in Opposition to Dkt. 14, Renewed Motion to Dismiss) (Colfax, Reed)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs response brief shall be due on or before May 17, 2021 entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
April 28, 2021 Filing 18 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE to Motion, filed by 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC, Medio Living GP, LLC, Medio Springs, LP, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation, re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response,, filed by Plaintiff Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritsche, R.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response,, by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Colfax, Reed)
April 21, 2021 Filing 16 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Bexar Management and Development Corporation. (Sanchez, Mark)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Consent/Non Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, Hogan Properties Company, Medio Living GP, LLC, Medio Springs, LP, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation re #13 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order,, Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial, (Fritsche, R.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 DEFENDANT'S REPLY to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, by 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Bexar Management and Development Corporation, Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC, Medio Living GP, LLC, Medio Springs, LP, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation. (Fritsche, R.) Modified text on 4/20/2021 (wg).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty five (45) days from the date of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Medio Living GP, LLC, Defendant Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Defendant Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Defendant San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation, Defendant Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Defendant Bexar Management and Development Corporation, Defendant Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Defendant Commonwealth Housing Corporation, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on, In the Alternative Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Defendant Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Defendant Medio Springs, LP, Defendant Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, Defendant Freedom SA Apartments, LP, #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Fed R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Hogan Properties Company, #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC (Colfax, Reed)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio.(Colfax, Reed)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Mark Anthony Sanchez added to party Bexar Management and Development Corporation(pty:dft) by Bexar Management and Development Corporation.(Sanchez, Mark)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on, In the Alternative Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, Medio Springs, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritsche, R.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by Bexar Management and Development Corporation, Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Medio Living GP, LLC, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritsche, R.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritsche, R.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Fed R. Civ. P. 12(e) Motion for More Definite Statement by Hogan Properties Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritsche, R.)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Soohyun Choi. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lila Miller. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd., Bexar Management and Development Corporation, Commonwealth Housing Corporation, Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC, Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd., Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC, Freedom SA Apartments, LP, Hillcrest Living GP, LLC, Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP, Hogan Properties Company, HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC, Medio Living GP, LLC, Medio Springs, LP, San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation. (wg)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed N. Colfax on behalf of S. Choi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14571447) by on behalf of Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio. (Colfax, Reed)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed N. Colfax on behalf of L. Miller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14571347) by on behalf of Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio. (Colfax, Reed)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio. (Colfax, Reed)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14570927), filed by Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Colfax, Reed)
March 9, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
March 9, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio v. HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Housing Corporation
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison Hills Living GP, LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bexar Management and Development Corporation
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Represented By: Mark Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 280SA Eagle Ridge, Ltd.
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medio Springs, LP
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth SA-Apartments, LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Properties Company
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom SA Apartments, LP
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Texas (Eagle Ridge), LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Housing Trust Public Facility Corporation
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medio Living GP, LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Texas (Willow Bend) Ltd.
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeSpring Residential Services, LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcrest Living GP, LLC
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcrest SA Apartments, LP
Represented By: R. David Fritsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Council of Greater San Antonio
Represented By: Reed N. Colfax
Represented By: Lila Miller
Represented By: Soohyun Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?