United States v. De Jesus et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A., Center for Psychological Development Inc. d/b/a CPD Integrated Healthcare, American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-tx PLLC, Dr. Alex De Jesus, Center for Psychological Development, Inc. doing business as CPD Integrated Healthcare and American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00331
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Richard B Farrer
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Alex De Jesus answer due 6/18/2021; Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A. answer due 6/18/2021. (mgr)
May 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines: American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC answer due 6/18/2021. (mgr)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as unopposed #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The deadline for Defendants Alex De Jesus, M.D. and Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to June 18, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as unopposed #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. The deadline for Defendant American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to June 18, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
May 19, 2021 Filing 23 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 500057721. (mgr)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Curtis, Oliver)
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Alex De Jesus, Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Barrera, Mark)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is this Court's policy to require all counsel to apply for admission to the Western District's federal bar and to follow through with the application as a condition of appearance pro hac vice in any case. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that, if counsel appearing pro hac vice has not already done so, counsel shall promptly submit an application to be admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas in the manner set forth in the Local Rules. The Court further ORDERS that counsel become familiar with the Local Court Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, a copy of which may be obtained from the United States District Clerk for the Western District of Texas or from the Courts website. If not already done, counsel appearing pro hac vice must immediately tender the amount of $100 to the Clerk of the Court, payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(2). Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel appearing pro hac vice, pursuant to Section 6 of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing in Civil and Criminal Cases in the Western District of Texas, must register as a filing user within ten (10) days of this Order. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
May 18, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
May 7, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Order #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Center for Psychological Development, Inc. (Roper, Richard) Modified on 5/10/2021 To edit text (bc).
May 6, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Center for Psychological Development, Inc. answer due 6/4/2021. (bc)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING as unopposed #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to June 4, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
May 4, 2021 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY (USING THE ATTACHMENT EVENT/EDIT TEXT) AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (bc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard B. Roper, III on behalf of Center for Psychological Development, Inc.. Attorney Richard B. Roper, III added to party Center for Psychological Development, Inc.(pty:dft) (Roper, Richard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING A PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE FILE THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY (USING THE ATTACHMENT EVENT/EDIT TEXT) AND LINK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION.*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Center for Psychological Development, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (Roper, Richard) Modified on 5/4/2021 To edit text (bc).
April 30, 2021 Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THE ENTRY WAS EDITED TO REFLECT AS A SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED***re #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service. (mgr)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Alex De Jesus served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. at Dckt 12 #10 Summons Issued (Van De Walle, Erin) Modified on 4/30/2021, to edit text (mgr).
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. #11 Summons Issued (Van De Walle, Erin) Modified on 4/30/2021, to edit text (mgr).
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021 #11 Summons Issued (Van De Walle, Erin) Modified on 4/30/2021, to edit text (mgr).
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States #10 Summons Issued (Van De Walle, Erin) This was inadvertently filed by the USAO and has been corrected with the filing of entry #15 (kc).
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC, Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A.. (mgr)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Alex De Jesus. (mgr)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Van De Walle, Erin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Van De Walle, Erin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Center for Psychological Development, Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Van De Walle, Erin) Modified on 4/19/2021 To edit text (bc).
April 19, 2021 Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED ALL PARTIES THAT THE ENTRY WAS MODIFIED TO CORRECT THE SERVICE DATE AND ANSWER DUE DATE.*** re #7 Certificate of Service. (bc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Center for Psychological Development, Inc.. (mgr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States. (Van De Walle, Erin)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex De Jesus. (cd)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States. (Van De Walle, Erin)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
April 2, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
April 2, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van De Walle, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. De Jesus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alex De Jesus Rheumatology, P.A.
Represented By: Mark J. Barrera
Represented By: Robert J. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Psychological Development Inc. d/b/a CPD Integrated Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-tx PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Alex De Jesus
Represented By: Mark J. Barrera
Represented By: Robert J. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Psychological Development, Inc. doing business as CPD Integrated Healthcare
Represented By: Richard B. Roper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arthritis & Rheumatology Associates-TX, PLLC
Represented By: Oliver Benton Curtis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Erin M. Van De Walle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?