Damron v. Houston County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Emmett Damron
Defendant: Houston County, Texas, Daphne Lynette Session, Donna Gordan Kaspar, Daisy Hernandez, Terri Meadows, Gwen Womack, Sarah Tunnel Clark, Clyde Black, Calyssa Womack, Houston County Sheriff Department, Randy Hardgrove, Ryan Martin, Jerry Kaelin, Ace Bail Bonds, Shanna Glawson, Carrie Ruth Ann Smith, N&N Bonding and Jim Neel
Case Number: 5:2021cv00665
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendations as to Timothy Emmett Damron. (bc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 Certified Mailing of #6 Report and Recommendations to Timothy Emmett Damron (bc)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy Emmett Damron. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause by Timothy Emmett Damron. (bc)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER as to Timothy Emmett Damron. Show Cause Response due by 8/31/2021. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (bc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Timothy Emmett Damron. (nm)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Timothy Emmett Damron.. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (nm)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Emmett Damron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (nm)
July 13, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (nm)
July 13, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damron v. Houston County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Emmett Damron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Lynette Session
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Gordan Kaspar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Tunnel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calyssa Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Hardgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Kaelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Bail Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanna Glawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Ruth Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N&N Bonding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?