Martinez v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Francisco Martinez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv00716
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Francisco Martinez. (Wood, Donald)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER --IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Oscar L. Cantu, Jr., is TERMINATED asattorney for Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following attorney is APPOINTED to represent Plaintiff in this case: Donald Craig Wood Walsh. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Wood contact Plaintiff within 21 days of thedate of this Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order (SEE Doc #4) ORDER APPOINTING Counsel: Oscar L. Cantu, Jr for Francisco Martinez. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (kc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT, filed by Francisco Martinez.(mgr)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; GRANTING #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Oscar L. Cantu, Jr for Francisco Martinez Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
August 3, 2021 Regenerated and emailed Order (doc #4) to Attorney Oscar L. Cantu (mgr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Francisco Martinez. (dtg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Francisco Martinez. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Francisco Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
July 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg)
July 28, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K. PULLIAM. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Martinez
Represented By: Donald Craig Wood
Represented By: Oscar L. Cantu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?