La Union Del Pueblo Entero, et al v. Gregory W. Abbott, et al
Plaintiff: La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Friendship-West Baptist Church, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Impact, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, JOLT Action, William C. Velasquez Institute, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Fiel Houston, Inc., Mi Familia Vota, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez and Paul Rutledge
Defendant: Jose A. Esparza, Lupe C. Torres, Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, Lisa Wise, Kim Ogg, Joe Gonzales, Jose Garza, John Creuzot, Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr., Yvonne Rosales, Rebecca Guerrero and Clifford Tatum
Petitioner: Public Interest Legal Foundation, Harris County Republican Party, Dallas County Republican Party, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Republican National Committee
Consolidated Plaintiff: Houston Justice, Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., The Arc of Texas, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, LULAC Texas, Vote Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Texas AFT, OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund, United States Of America and Voto Latino
Consolidated Defendant: Jacque Callanen, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott and Jane Nelson
Counter Defendant: Dana DeBeauvoir
Amicus Curiae: Foundation for Government Accountability, John R. Ashcroft and Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition
Case Number: 5:2021cv00844
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #578 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #577 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Laura Brady Bender is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for the United States of America, which will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 579 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:( Bench Trial set for 9/11/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,, Discovery due by 4/28/2023,, Motions due by 5/12/2023,),. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 578 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Dolling for Veronikah Warms ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17260709) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas. (Dolling, Zachary)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney L. Brady Bender by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bender, Laura)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute Regarding Proposed Scheduling Orders. (Perales, Nina)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Omeed Alerasool by James A. Rodman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17243572) by on behalf of LULAC Texas. (Rodman, James) Modified on 3/27/2023 To edit text (bc).
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Marisa O'Gara by James A. Rodman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17243288) by on behalf of LULAC Texas. (Rodman, James) Modified on 3/27/2023 To edit text (bc).
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #575 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #574 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE BY DEFENDANT LISA WISE REGARDING PARTIES' PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDERS by Lisa Wise (Armon, Orion)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Proposed Scheduling Order by all Plaintiffs, State Defendants and Defendant Intervenors by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 571 NOTICE Proposed scheduling order by Jacque Callanen (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cubriel, Lisa)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 570 COPY of Letter of transmittal from USCA to Ms. Kathleen Theresa Hunker received for #567 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory.***We have docketed the appeal and ask you to use the case number above in future inquiries.*** (dtg)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah C. Stewart Megan Rusciano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BTXWDC-17225386) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Sarah)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #568 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #569 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #561 by Paul Bettencourt, Briscoe Cain. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number ATXWDC-17218715). Attorney Kathleen Hunker added to party Paul Bettencourt(pty:oth), Attorney Kathleen Hunker added to party Briscoe Cain(pty:oth) (Hunker, Kathleen)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel,. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (nm)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 566 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lisa Wise for proceedings held on 11-14-22. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motion to Compel. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Armon, Orion)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 565 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF THE EL PASO COUNTY ELECTIONS ADMINISTRATOR by Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 564 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lisa Wise for proceedings held on 3-07-2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motions for Clarification and to Compel. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Armon, Orion)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3-7-23, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/31/2023, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2023, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2023, Appeal Record due by 3/27/2023, (gs)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER GRANTING #542 Motion ; GRANTING #547 Motion to Compel. The parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed scheduling order to govern the remainder of this case no later than March 21, 2023. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to issue a serve a third-party subpoena under Rule 45 on Mr. Vera in connection with his re-deposition directing him to produce the documents identified in Requests for Production Numbers 1.and 3. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, re #547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Plaintiff Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gore, John)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Parreno on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party Fiel Houston, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party JOLT Action(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party La Union Del Pueblo Entero(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party Mexican American Bar Association of Texas(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party Southwest Voter Registration Education Project(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Parreno added to party William C. Velasquez Institute(pty:pla) (Parreno, Kenneth)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 558 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by La Union Del Pueblo Entero for proceedings held on 03/07/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motions for Clarification and to Compel. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Ryan, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 557 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS for proceedings held on 02/27/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Hunker, Kathleen)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS for proceedings held on 03/07/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motions for Clarification and to Compel Production. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Hunker, Kathleen)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 3/7/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(wg)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 555 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, re #547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Plaintiff Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma (Hunker, Kathleen)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 554 SUPPLEMENT to #547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY - EXHIBIT M by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 553 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Dodge, Christopher)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 552 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice of Plaintiff Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma Regions by Friendship-West Baptist Church, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Berry, Patrick)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER GRANTING #549 Motion to Withdraw Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER re #547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY filed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Friendship-West Baptist Church, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Set Motion Hearing for #547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY ( Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2023 4:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Unopposed MOTION to withdraw Workers Defense Action Fund as a party by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #548 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Longoria, Julia)
March 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Opposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND TO COMPEL TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANT INTERVENOR HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Longoria, Julia)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE of Designation of Rebuttal Experts by Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS (Hunker, Kathleen)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER re #542 Joint MOTION for Clarification re #437 Scheduling Order, filed by United States Of America, Set Motion Hearing for #542 Joint MOTION for Clarification re #437 Scheduling Order, ( Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2023 4:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #544 Motion to Supplement Joint Motion for Clarification #542 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 544 MOTION to supplement re #542 Joint MOTION for Clarification re #437 Scheduling Order, Dallas County by John Creuzot, Michael Scarpello. (Stool, Ben)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Joint MOTION for Clarification re #437 Scheduling Order, by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 541 SUPPLEMENT to #387 Notice (Other) by Clifford Tatum. (Birring, Sameer)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 540 SUPPLEMENT to #399 Notice of Filing, OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' and HAUL Plaintiffs' Sixth Supplemental Initial Disclosures by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Dolling, Zachary)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 539 SUPPLEMENT to #135 Notice (Other) by Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS. (Hunker, Kathleen)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 538 SUPPLEMENT to #400 Notice of Filing, FIFTH SUPPLEMENT TO LUPE PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Longoria, Julia)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 537 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Disclosures by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Gore, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 536 SUPPLEMENT to #132 Notice (Other) of Amended Initial Disclosures by United States Of America. (Paikowsky, Dana)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Holmes Breanna Williams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17119386) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Holmes, Jennifer)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #535 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #534 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Gore for Louis J. Capozzi III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17111650) by on behalf of Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gore, John)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Alcantara Harris for Dayton Campbell-Harris ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17106139) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Harris, Ashley)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #531 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Meaghan E. Mixon is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT ("LULAC Plaintiffs") and shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. The LULAC Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #532 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The general election discovery period deadline for the LULAC Plaintiffs to file their designation of Dr. Mayer as a testifying expert, and to serve on all parties the materials required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) that are specific to Dr. Mayer's report, is hereby extended to March 6, 2023. The deadline for any rebuttal reports specific to Dr. Mayer is similarly extended to March 27, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #533 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines as to Dr. Kenneth Mayer's Expert Report Deadline for the General Election Discovery Period by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Meaghan Mixon by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Mixon, Meaghan)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2-16-23, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2023, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2023, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2023, Appeal Record due by 3/6/2023, (gs)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 2/16/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi.)(nm) Modified on 2/27/2023 to correct date (nm).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #491 Motion to Compel entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Motion to Compel entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiffs are directed to serve Defendant Ogg with additional interrogatories as specified in open court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #526 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. R. Gary Spencer is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., The Arc of Texas, and Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons (collectively, the HAUL Plaintiffs). The HAUL Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Letter of transmittal from USCA received for #457 #158 #459 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, filed by Warren K. Paxton, Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Jane Nelson, STATE OF TEXAS.***The court has granted-in-part an extension of time to and including March 20, 2023 for filing appellants reply brief in this case.*** (dtg)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Saldivar on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. Attorney Edgar Saldivar added to party League of Women Voters of Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Edgar Saldivar added to party OCA-Greater Houston(pty:conpla), Attorney Edgar Saldivar added to party REVUP-Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Edgar Saldivar added to party Workers Defense Action Fund(pty:conpla) (Saldivar, Edgar)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher D. Hilton on behalf of Gregory W. Abbott, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS. Attorney Christopher D. Hilton added to party Gregory W. Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D. Hilton added to party Jane Nelson(pty:condft), Attorney Christopher D. Hilton added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher D. Hilton added to party STATE OF TEXAS(pty:condft) (Hilton, Christopher)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney R. Gary Spencer by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, R.)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Letter of transmittal from USCA received for #457 #458 #459 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, filed by Warren K. Paxton, Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Jane Nelson, STATE OF TEXAS.***The court has granted appellees motion to file brief out of time in this case.*** (dtg)
February 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #521 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. William T. Thompson is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants Gregory W. Abbott, in his official capacity as Governor of Texas, Jane Nelson, in her official capacity as Secretary of State Texas, Warren K. Paxton, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas, Jose A. Esparza, in his official capacity as Deputy Secretary of State, and the State of Texas (collectively, the "State Defendants"). The State Defendants will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE of Designation of General Election Expert by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino (Dodge, Christopher)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 523 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by United States Of America. (Stewart, Michael)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Supplement to re #516 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines as to Expert Discovery for the General Election Plaintiff Houston Area Urban League, et al.'s Supplemental Expert Designations, MOTION to Appoint Expert by Houston Area Urban League. (Stewart, Sarah) Modified on 2/13/2023 to edit text (nm).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Jane Nelson, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, William)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Pretrial Disclosures Designation of Potential Testifying Experts by Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #519 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Sherine Thomas is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Defendants Dyana Limon-Mercado and Jos Garza (collectively, Travis County Defendants), who will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sherine Thomas by Jose Garza, Rebecca Guerrero. (Nelson, Anthony)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER GRANTING #516 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 516 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines as to Expert Discovery for the General Election by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 515 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by John Creuzot, Michael Scarpello. (Stool, Ben)
January 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #514 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to conclude discoveryrelated to the 2022 Primary Election by or upon Defendant Intervenors Harris County Republican Party, et al. is hereby extended to March 3, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #513 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery RELATED TO THE 2022 PRIMARY ELECTION BY OR UPON DEFENDANT INTERVENORS HARRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN PARTY, ET AL. by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Longoria, Julia)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan Robyn Sanders ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17006499) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 512 STIPULATION Regarding Disclosure of General Election Witnesses by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Change of Address by Uzoma N. Nkwonta (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Dooley Dodge (Dodge, Christopher)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #509 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #508 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Dolling Washington, Gergory ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16955454) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Dolling, Zachary)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Dolling Bernstein, Alyssa G. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16955403) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Dolling, Zachary)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Change of Address by Noah B. Baron (Baron, Noah)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marcos Mocine-Mcqueen (Mocine-Mcqueen, Marcos)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elena Rodriguez Armenta (Armenta, Elena)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniela Lorenzo (Lorenzo, Daniela)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael B. Jones (Jones, Michael)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 502 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Consol Plaintiff Workers Defense Action Fund, Consol Plaintiff REVUP-Texas, Consol Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Texas, Consol Plaintiff OCA-Greater Houston in support of Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dolling, Zachary)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Aaron Barnes on behalf of Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. Attorney J. Aaron Barnes added to party Gregory W. Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney J. Aaron Barnes added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney J. Aaron Barnes added to party STATE OF TEXAS(pty:condft), Attorney J. Aaron Barnes added to party John Scott(pty:condft) (Barnes, J.)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #498 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Urja Mittal is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #496 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Graham W. White is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT, who shall continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #499 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Sophia Cai is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #497 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The pending motion to compel #491 is re-set for a hearing on Thursday, February 16, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Motion Hearing: #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2023 2:30 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 500 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kim Ogg, re #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Consol Plaintiff Workers Defense Action Fund, Consol Plaintiff REVUP-Texas, Consol Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Texas, Consol Plaintiff OCA-Greater Houston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Nichols, Eric)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sophia Cai by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Urja Mittal by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing)(Giese, Victoria)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Graham W. White) by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER re #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Workers Defense Action Fund, REVUP-Texas, League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, Set Motion Hearing for #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents ( Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2023 3:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Danielle Ahlrich by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahlrich, Danielle)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #494 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Danielle Ahlrich is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, The Arc of Texas, and Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons (the "HAUL Plaintiffs"). The HAUL Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #493 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Ogg to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #491 is hereby extended to January 6, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE of Change of Address by Germaine Maria Habell (Habell, Germaine)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Opposed MOTION to Compel Defendant Ogg's Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #469 Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #471 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Berde by La Union Del Pueblo Entero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance as Counsel)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #489 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Matthew Berde is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Friendship-West Baptist Church, the Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma Regions, Texas Impact, and James Lewin, who shall continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #488 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Patrick K. Sweeten is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendants Gregory W. Abbott, in his official capacity as Governor of Texas, John Scott, in his official capacity as Secretary of State Texas, Warren K. Paxton, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas, Jose A. Esparza, in his official capacity as Deputy Secretary of State, and the State of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 11-14-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/19/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2023, Appeal Record due by 12/13/2022, (gs)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 RESPONSE to #484 Brief, by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Gore, John)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory W. Abbott, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott for proceedings held on 11/14/22. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Thompson, William)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 BRIEF ON THE APPLICATION OF THE FIRST AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE TO DEPOSITIONS by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Longoria, Julia)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 BRIEF Regarding Plaintiffs' Noticed Depositions by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Gore, John)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #482 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Ryan Cox is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund, which will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #481 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Mimi Marziani is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund, who shall continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ryan Cox by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mimi Marziani by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute for proceedings held on 11/14/2022. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Perales, Nina)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2022 re #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel. (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fatima L Menendez on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party Fiel Houston, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party JOLT Action(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party La Union Del Pueblo Entero(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party Mexican American Bar Association of Texas(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party Southwest Voter Registration Education Project(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education(pty:pla), Attorney Fatima L Menendez added to party William C. Velasquez Institute(pty:pla) (Menendez, Fatima)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, re #471 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant National Republican Congressional Committee, Defendant Harris County Republican Party, Defendant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant Republican National Committee, Defendant National Republican Senatorial Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gore, John)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen Hunker on behalf of Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. Attorney Kathleen Hunker added to party Gregory W. Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Hunker added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Hunker added to party John Scott(pty:condft) (Hunker, Kathleen)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Memorandum in Support, filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, re #471 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant National Republican Congressional Committee, Defendant Harris County Republican Party, Defendant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant Republican National Committee, Defendant National Republican Senatorial Committee, #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production and Interrogatories and to Amend the Scheduling Order as to Defendant Intervenors filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Signed Declaration)(Longoria, Julia)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #471 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant National Republican Congressional Committee, Defendant Harris County Republican Party, Defendant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant Republican National Committee, Defendant National Republican Senatorial Committee, #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production and Interrogatories and to Amend the Scheduling Order as to Defendant Intervenors filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas (Freeman, Daniel)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING re #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel #471 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2022 1:00 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production and Interrogatories and to Amend the Scheduling Order as to Defendant Intervenors filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee, re #469 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production and Interrogatories and to Amend the Scheduling Order as to Defendant Intervenors filed by Plaintiff Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Plaintiff Texas Impact, Plaintiff William C. Velasquez Institute, Plaintiff Fiel Houston, Inc., Plaintiff JOLT Action, Plaintiff James Lewin, Plaintiff Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Plaintiff Friendship-West Baptist Church, Plaintiff The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas and CROSS-MOTION for a Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Proposed Order)(Gore, John) Modified on 11/1/2022 (rg).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDERED, that the text orders issued on November 16, 2021 denying the motions to appear pro hac vice filed on behalf of counsel E. Stewart Crosland (ECF No. 71) and Stephen J. Kenny (ECF No. 72) are WITHDRAWN. The pro hac vice motions (ECF Nos. 71 & 72) are GRANTED re Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production and Interrogatories and to Amend the Scheduling Order as to Defendant Intervenors by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, LULAC Texas, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Letter of transmittal from USCA received for #451 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, filed by Kim Ogg.***The court has taken the following action in this case: The motion to withdraw as counsel is hereby GRANTED.*** (dtg)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE of Change of Address by Germaine Maria Habell (Habell, Germaine)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #465 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Georgina C. Yeomans for Plaintiffs Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., The Arc of Texas, and Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, (collectively, "Plaintiffs") is withdrawn, and she shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER of USCA (certified copy). re #451 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory.***IT IS ORDERED that the Appellant Kim Oggs opposed motion to stay all further discovery and related proceedings against her or her office in the district court, pending this Courts resolution of her interlocutory appeal of the denial of Oggs motion to dismiss based on the legal defense of sovereign immunity, is DENIED.*** (Attachments: #1 TRANSMITTAL LETTER FROM USCA5)(dtg)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #22-50777 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #458 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #22-50778 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #459 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Georgina C. Yeomans by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yeomans, Georgina)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #22-50775 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #457 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER of USCA (certified copy). re #451 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory.***PER CURIAM: IT IS ORDERED that a temporary adminstrative stay is being placed on all discovery and related proceedings in the district court until September 29, 2022, until further order may issue.*** (Attachments: #1 TRANSMITTAL LETTER FROM USCA5)(dtg)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #22-50732 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #451 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott for dates of n/a. Proceedings Transcribed: n/a. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox.. (Thompson, William)***Modified TEXT on 9/15/2022 (dtg)***TRANSCRIPT IS UNNECESSARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES.***
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott for dates of n/a. Proceedings Transcribed: n/a. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox.. (Thompson, William)******Modified TEXT on 9/15/2022 (dtg)***TRANSCRIPT IS UNNECESSARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES.***
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott for dates of n/a. Proceedings Transcribed: n/a. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox.. (Thompson, William)***Modified TEXT on 9/15/2022 (dtg)***TRANSCRIPT IS UNNECESSARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES.***
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John R. Hardin by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #460 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. John R. Hardin is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #448 by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #447 by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #449 by Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #448 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #447 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #449 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (wg)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disorbo, Jack)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #456 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Mr. Jack DiSorbo is WITHDRAWN from his representation in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldlc)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Eric Nichols The wrong event was used for this document. Please refile using the event "Appeal Transcript Request" even though you are not requesting a transcript the Fifth Circuit needs to receive a copy of this Transcript Order Form. re #454 Notice of Filing (rg)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 NOTICE of Filing Transcript Order Form by Kim Ogg (Nichols, Eric)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Hawley, Jonathan)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #453 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Jonathan P. Hawley is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Voto Latino. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MOTION to Stay by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #452 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Court has already addressed the merits of Defendant Kim Ogg's arguments in its order granting in part and denying part her motion to dismiss. Further, the discovery requests are relevant and responses thereto may be secured from Defendant Ogg either as a party to this case or a third party. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #450 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Kim Ogg. Filing fee $505.00, receipt number ATXWDC-16384323. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rg)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #450 by Kim Ogg. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number ATXWDC-16384323) (Nichols, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #344 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted against Kim Ogg. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #255 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #240 Motion to Dismiss the claims that OCA-Greater Houston, League of Woman Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund have asserted against them Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #239 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Davis, Lia)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #446 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Lia Sifuentes Davis is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, and Workers Defense Action Fund. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Hofer on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. Attorney Peter Hofer added to party League of Women Voters of Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Peter Hofer added to party OCA-Greater Houston(pty:conpla), Attorney Peter Hofer added to party REVUP-Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Peter Hofer added to party Workers Defense Action Fund(pty:conpla) (Hofer, Peter)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #243 Motion to Dismiss. Any and all claims challenging section 7.04 of S.B. 1, as codified in section 276.018 of the Texas Election Code, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any and all claims challenging portions of section 6.04 of S.B. 1 that the district courtenjoined in OCA Greater Hous. v. Texas, No. 1:15-CV-679-RP, 2022 WL 2019295 (W.D. Tex. June 6, 2022) are MOOT. All other claims that LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, the Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT have asserted against the Texas Secretary of State and the Texas Attorney General may proceed. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A. Rodman on behalf of Texas AFT. Attorney James A. Rodman added to party Texas AFT(pty:conpla) (Rodman, James)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Attorney Jasmine M. Johnson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16225698) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #442 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Daniela Lorenzo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16205525) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #441 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Joint Notice related to the OCA Injunction Modification Order by United States Of America re #438 Notice (Other), (Yun, Jennifer)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Haley Costello Essig by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Essig, Haley)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #439 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Haley K. Costello Essig is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Modified Permanent Injunction Regarding Sections 61.032, 61.033, and 64.0321 of the Texas Election Code by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Modifying Permanent Injunction)(Dolling, Zachary)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #22-50435 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #426 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/17/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Partly Agreed Proposed Amended Schedule by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ANSWER to #131 Amended Complaint by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott.(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #434 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The parties must file a proposed scheduling order no later than today, June 7, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #432 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Christina M. Beeler for Defendant Isabel Longoria, in her Official Capacity as Harris County Elections Administrator is withdrawn and shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Paul Bettencourt, Briscoe Cain, Bryan Hughes, Andrew Murr for dates of 05/13/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motion to Compel. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox.. (Sweeten, Patrick)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christina M. Beeler by Isabel Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beeler, Christina)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #431 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. No later than June 6, 2022, the parties must file a proposed scheduling order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles E.T. Roberts on behalf of Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Roberts, Charles)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER GRANTING #428 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #427 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Liliana Zaragoza for Plaintiffs is withdrawn, and she shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by remaining counsel of record. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Paul Bettencourt, Briscoe Cain, Bryan Hughes, Andrew Murr. (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Liliana Zaragoza by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zaragoza, Liliana)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #425 Order on Motion to Compel by Paul Bettencourt, Briscoe Cain, Bryan Hughes, Andrew Murr. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rg)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #425 by Paul Bettencourt, Bryan Hughes, Andrew Murr, Briscoe Cain.. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Paul Bettencourt(pty:oth), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Bryan Hughes(pty:oth), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Andrew Murr(pty:oth), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Briscoe Cain(pty:oth) (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER GRANTING #391 Motion to Compel. The State Legislators are ORDERED to produce all documents, with the exception of DOC_0000477, as specified in Appendix A below, by June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER DENYING #145 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 5-13-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/14/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2022, (gs)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino for proceedings held on 5/13/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcix. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #421 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon on Behalf of Caroline A. Lebel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16059592) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Elena Rodriguez Armenta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16058928) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery by Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute for proceedings held on May 13, 2022.. (Perales, Nina)***Modified TEXT on 5/24/2022 (dtg).***COURT REPORTER: GIGI SIMCOX.***
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #420 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roswill Mejia on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. Attorney Roswill Mejia added to party Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons(pty:conpla), Attorney Roswill Mejia added to party Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.(pty:conpla), Attorney Roswill Mejia added to party Houston Area Urban League(pty:conpla), Attorney Roswill Mejia added to party The Arc of Texas(pty:conpla) (Mejia, Roswill)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott re #397 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott for proceedings held on 05/13/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox. (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Deadlines by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Michael)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #414 Motion to Vacate entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. No later than June 1, 2022, the parties must file a proposed scheduling order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Remanding Notice of Appeal,, filed by National Republican Congressional Committee, Harris County Republican Party, Dallas County Republican Party, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, #123 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), filed by National Republican Congressional Committee, Harris County Republican Party, Dallas County Republican Party, Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee.***This cause was considered on the record on appeal and was argued by counsel. IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is REVERSED and REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party bear its own costs on appeal.*** (Attachments: #1 TRANSMITTAL LETTER FROM USCA5)(dtg)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LULAC Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #413 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Domingo A. Garcia for Plaintiff LULAC Texas is withdrawn and shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #406 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. For the reasons stated in open court, this motion is hereby moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ANSWER to #199 Amended Complaint, by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 1:20-CV-786, #2 5:21-CV-848, #3 1:21-CV-780)(rg)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2022 re #391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers filed by Texas AFT, LULAC Texas, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcix.)(rg)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 SUPPLEMENT Disclosures by State Defendants' by Gregory W. Abbott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 1 - 8 by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Houston Area Urban League, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of Women Voters of Texas, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Paul Rutledge, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, Texas Organizing Project, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, The Arc of Texas, William C. Velasquez Institute re #408 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 2 2022 Email - RE_ LUPE v. Abbott, 5_21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.) - Private Plaintiff Disclosure, #2 Exhibit 2 - US Supplement to Amended Initial Disclosures (April 1, 2022), #3 Exhibit 3 - Emails RE_ LUPE v. Abbott, 5_21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.) - Private Plaintiff Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4 - Emails Re_ OCA-GH Witness Availability, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email with attachment Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Initial Disclosures, LUPE v. Texas, No. 5_21-CV-0844-XR, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email re LUPE v. Texas 5_21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.) - Availability of Tanesa Lee, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2021.11.16 La Union v. Abbott Hearing Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - March 23 2022 Rule 45 Subpoena L. Hidalgo)(Yeomans, Georgina)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Houston Area Urban League, JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, League of Women Voters of Texas, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Paul Rutledge, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, Texas Organizing Project, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, The Arc of Texas, William C. Velasquez Institute, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #406 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Yeomans, Georgina)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #406 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Supplement to Initial Disclosures), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Garza Subpoena), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Anchia Subpoena), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (State Defendants' First Set of RFPs and Interrogatories), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Appendix A to US Second RFPs), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Guillen Subpoena), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (LULAC v Abbott Scheduling Order))(Stewart, Michael)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #402 Renewed Motion to Intervene entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The motion is GRANTED in light of the Fifth Circuits conclusion that the Republican Committees have satisfied Rule 24(a)(2)s requirements for intervention as of right. See La Union del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, 29 F.4th 299 (5th Cir. 2022). The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed Answers, attached as exhibits to the motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Angelica Lien Leo by Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Rogelio Rodriguez Responses to requests for production do not get filed here in Federal Court. This is part of the Discovery process which goes between attorneys. re #401 Notice of Filing (rg)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #405 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Angelica Lien Leo is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Lisa Wise. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers filed by Consol Plaintiff Texas AFT, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas, Consol Plaintiff Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Consol Plaintiff Vote Latino (Dodge, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Opposed MOTION to Intervene by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Proposed Answer, #5 Proposed Answer)(Gore, John)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE of Filing Defendant DA Rosales's Response to State Defendant's Request for Production by Yvonne Rosales (Rodriguez, Rogelio)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE of Filing Private Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute (Longoria, Julia)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Filing Private Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PLAINTIFFS FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES)(Yeomans, Georgina)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE of Service of Corrected Expert Report by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas (Broughton, Kenneth)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers filed by Consol Plaintiff Texas AFT, Consol Plaintiff LULAC Texas, Consol Plaintiff Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Consol Plaintiff Vote Latino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email of 02.24.2022, #2 Exhibit Email of 03.14.2022, #3 Exhibit Deposition subpoenas, #4 Exhibit Email of 03.29.2022, #5 Exhibit Written discovery to LULAC Plaintiffs, #6 Exhibit Letter of 04.15.2022, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Senator Bryan Hughes, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Senator Paul Bettencourt, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Representative Andrew Murr, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Representative Briscoe Cain, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan White)(Sweeten, Patrick)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Expert Report by United States Of America (Freeman, Daniel)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE VACATION LETTER, ATTORNEY by John Creuzot (Nicholas, Barbara)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Lupe, OCA-Greater Houston, Haul, Lulac, and Mi Familia Vota Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by La Union Del Pueblo Entero (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Private Plaintiffs Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures)(Broughton, Kenneth)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER Setting Hearing on #391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers: Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2022 3:30 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Counsel for the State Legislators is hereby ORDERED to file a response to Plaintiffs motion no later than May 9, 2022. Any reply must be filed no later than May 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 APPENDIX to #391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Dodge, Christopher)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Texas Lawmakers by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #334 Motion for Protective Order. The deposition of Texas Secretary of State John B. Scott is STAYED until such time as the United States completes the depositions of Keith Ingram, ChristinaAdkins, and the 30(b)(6) deposition of the Office of the Texas Secretary of State. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Expert Report by United States Of America (Stewart, Michael)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Service of Supplements to Expert Reports by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino (Dodge, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE Amended Initial Disclosures by Isabel Longoria (Bingham, Tiffany)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (White, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Expert Report by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas re #295 Notice (Other) (Broughton, Kenneth)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Service of Rebuttal Expert Reports by Mi Familia Vota (Olson, Wendy)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #386 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Jeffrey M. White is hereby withdrawn as counsel for the State Defendants in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #383 Motion for Hearing entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Court is aware of the importance of the issues raised in the State Defendants' motions to dismiss and is working as expeditiously as possible to resolve these motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION for Hearing on the State Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 SUPPLEMENT to Amended Initial Disclosures by United States Of America. (Paikowsky, Dana)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE of Private Plaintiffs' 2nd Supplemental Initial Disclosures by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolling, Zachary)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kim Ogg, re #344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kim Ogg Defendant Kim Ogg's Reply to The OCA Plaintiffs' Responses to Ogg's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nichols, Eric)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE to State Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority to #333 Notice (Other),,, by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Dolling, Zachary)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Kim Ogg, re #344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kim Ogg (Nichols, Eric)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kim Ogg (Dolling, Zachary)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr for Applicant Victor Genecin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15940326) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Kenneth)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Marc Rasich by Mi Familia Vota. (Olson, Wendy)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Friendship-West Baptist Church, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Initial Disclosures)(Singh, Jasleen)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #375 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #374 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Marc Rasich, formerly of Stoel Rives LLP, admitted pro hac vice on October 6, 2021, is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs Mi Familia Vota, et al. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2022 re #353 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Former Texas Secretary of State filed by John Scott, Warren K. Paxton, Gregory W. Abbott, STATE OF TEXAS. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter GiGi Simcox.)(rg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #353 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #353 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Former Texas Secretary of State filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Sweeten, Patrick)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry L. Roberson on behalf of Jacque Callanen, Joe Gonzales. Attorney Larry L. Roberson added to party Jacque Callanen(pty:condft), Attorney Larry L. Roberson added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:dft) (Roberson, Larry)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE VACATION LETTER by John Creuzot (Stool, Ben)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING #363 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Bench Trial set for 7/5/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Discovery due by 5/13/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #366 Motion entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff Texas Organizing Project is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All other OCA-GH Plaintiffs remain a party to this action, and the dismissal of Texas Organizing Project does not affect remaining OCA-GH Plaintiffs' claims against any defendants. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mi Familia Vota, re #334 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Texas Secretary of State filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3.21.22 Email, #2 Exhibit 4.1.22 Email)(Watkins, Elijah)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Texas Organizing Project as a Party by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolling, Zachary)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaywin Singh Malhi on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Jaywin Singh Malhi added to party United States Of America(pty:conpla) (Malhi, Jaywin)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Brady Bender on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Laura Brady Bender added to party United States Of America(pty:conpla) (Bender, Laura)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines for Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa A. Snead on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. Attorney Lisa A. Snead added to party League of Women Voters of Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Lisa A. Snead added to party REVUP-Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Lisa A. Snead added to party Texas Organizing Project(pty:conpla), Attorney Lisa A. Snead added to party Workers Defense Action Fund(pty:conpla) (Snead, Lisa)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kim Ogg (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge, The Arc of Texas, re #344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kim Ogg (Yeomans, Georgina)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #357 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #356 Motion entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant DA Yvonne Rosales is excused from active participation in Case Nos. 5:21-CV-00844-XR and 1:21-CV-0786-XR, including any obligation to file responsive pleadings and to attend hearings, conferences, and trial, unless otherwise ordered. Defendant DA Rosales must comply with any and all discovery obligations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE State Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority to #333 Notice (Other),,, by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge, The Arc of Texas. (Yeomans, Georgina)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RESPONSE to State Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority to #333 Notice (Other),,, by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Dolling for Sophia Cai ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15903606) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Dolling, Zachary)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Unopposed MOTION to Be Excused from Active Participation by Yvonne Rosales. (Rodriguez, Rogelio)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Designation of Potential Rebuttal Testifying Experts by Jose Garza, Rebecca Guerrero re #125 Scheduling Order, (Nelson, Anthony)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Plaintiff Mi Familia Vota is hereby ORDERED to file a response to the State Defendants motion, no later than April 12, 2022. Any reply must be filed no later than April 14, 2022. Set Motion Hearing for #353 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Former Texas Secretary of State (Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 3:30 PM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg).
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Former Texas Secretary of State by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Ruth R. Hughs, #2 Exhibit B- State Defendant's Correspondence with MFV and US)(Sweeten, Patrick)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Christopher D. Dodge ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15888929) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hardin, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #352 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #350 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUPTexas, Texas Organizing Project, and Workers Defense Action Fund's deadline to respond to Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss is extended to April 19, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #351 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Kathryn E. Yukevich is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiffs LULAC Texas, Voto Latino, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, and Texas AFT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
April 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kathryn E. Yukevich by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Yukevich, Kathryn)
April 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Kim Ogg's motion to dismiss, Dkt. # 344, by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting motion and extending deadline to respond to Defendant Kim Ogg's motion to dismiss until April 19, 2022.)(Dolling, Zachary)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #334 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Texas Secretary of State filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #348 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant Yvonne Rosales must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint at ECF No. 208, no later than April 7, 2022.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Yvonne Rosales answer due 4/7/2022. (rg)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yvonne Rosales. (Rodriguez, Rogelio)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER GRANTING #343 Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order Regarding Production of Ultrasensitive Information. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #334 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Texas Secretary of State filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Paikowsky, Dana)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kim Ogg's Motion to Dismiss by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Nichols, Eric)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order Regarding Production of Ultrasensitive Information by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berry, Patrick)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 THIS DEFICIENCY WAS ISSUED IN ERROR. ACCESS WILL BE RESTRICTED. DEFICIENCY NOTICE Discovery Documents, responses to requests for production, any kind of information regarding this type of documents does not get filed here in Federal Court. That information stays between parties and attorneys. re #340 Notice Regarding Requests for Production (rg) Modified on 3/25/2022 (rg).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE of Designation of Potential Testifying Experts by John Creuzot, Michael Scarpello re #209 Stipulation, (Nicholas, Barbara)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE of Designation of Potential Testifying Experts by John Creuzot, Michael Scarpello re #209 Stipulation, (Nicholas, Barbara)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE of Designation of Potential Testifying Experts by Jose Garza, Rebecca Guerrero re #125 Scheduling Order, (Nelson, Anthony)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 RESPONSE to #333 Notice (Other),,, by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER The Court hereby STAYS the deposition of Texas Secretary of State John B. Scott pending resolution of the instant discovery motion and the State Defendants motion to dismiss the claims brought by the United States. A response to the instant discovery motion must be filed no later than March 29, 2022. Any reply must be filed no later than April 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Bradley R. Prowant ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15839126) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota. (Lyons, Sean)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Mark L. Bieter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15839066) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota. (Lyons, Sean)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #335 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #336 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Texas Secretary of State by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John B. Scott, #2 Exhibit B - United States' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - United States' First Set of Requests for Admission, #4 Exhibit D - United States' First Set of Requests for Production, #5 Exhibit E - United States' Second Set of Requests for Production, #6 Exhibit F - United States' Third Set of Requests for Production, #7 Exhibit G - State Defs' Objections and Responses to the United States' First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H - United States' Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of the Texas Secretary of State, #9 Exhibit I - United States' Notice of Deposition of John Scott, #10 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott re #300 Reply to Response to Motion, #195 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #239 MOTION to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #243 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #301 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #255 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #264 Reply to Response to Motion, #313 Reply to Response to Motion, #306 Reply to Response to Motion, #240 MOTION to Dismiss the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, #223 Reply to Response to Motion, #145 MOTION to Dismiss the Federal Government's Claims, #281 Response to Motion, #252 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Hudson, Eric)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Defendant Garza's ANSWER to #200 Amended Complaint by OCA-GH Plaintiffs by Jose Garza.(Nelson, Anthony)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ranjana Natarajan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15828577) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Defendant Garza's ANSWER to #199 Amended Complaint, by HAUL Plaintiffs by Jose Garza.(Nelson, Anthony)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #326 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #331 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Defendant Garza's ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint, by LUPE Plaintiffs by Jose Garza.(Nelson, Anthony)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Defendant Garza's ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, by LULAC Plaintiffs. Attorney Anthony J. Nelson added to party Jose Garza(pty:dft) by Jose Garza.(Nelson, Anthony)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr..(Tognetti, Leigh)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leigh Ann Tognetti for Michael J Garza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15823828) by on behalf of Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tognetti, Leigh). According to our records, filing party submitted duplicate PHV payments. This fee was returned back to the filer by their financial institution. The original payment made on 3/16/22 via a previous incomplete docket entry is the actual payment assigned to this matter: 0542-15823549(kc).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Dolling on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. Attorney Zachary Dolling added to party League of Women Voters of Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Zachary Dolling added to party OCA-Greater Houston(pty:conpla), Attorney Zachary Dolling added to party REVUP-Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Zachary Dolling added to party Texas Organizing Project(pty:conpla), Attorney Zachary Dolling added to party Workers Defense Action Fund(pty:conpla) (Dolling, Zachary)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #199 Amended Complaint, by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #200 Amended Complaint by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Yvonne Rosales served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Hardin, John)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #323 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Ogg shall answer or otherwise respond to the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #200 on or before March 29, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #324 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer HAUL Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Ogg shall answer or otherwise respond to the HAUL Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #199 on or before March 29, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #207 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #319 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant Garza's deadline to respond to the LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #208 is hereby extended to March 16, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #317 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer HAUL Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant Garza's deadline to respond to the HAUL Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #199 is hereby extended to March 17, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #320 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant Garza's deadline to respond to the LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #207 is hereby extended to March 16, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #321 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Defendant Garza's deadline to respond to the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #200 is hereby extended to March 17, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 DEFENDANT, JOSE GARZA, TRAVIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #200 Amended Complaint by Jose Garza. (wg)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 DEFENDANT, JOSE GARZA, TRAVIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #208 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (wg)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 AMENDED ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint, by John Creuzot. (Nicholas, Barbara)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #199 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #315 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #316 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy for Susan Mizner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15794996) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy for Brian Dimmick ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15794984) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by John Creuzot.(Nicholas, Barbara)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #255 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #308 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Scheduling Order #125 shall be modified to include the following: Number and Timing of Depositions. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(a)(2)(A)(i), the parties may depose any person, including a party, without further leave of Court unless the deposition would result in more than 50 depositions or more than 250 hours of deposition testimony being taken under Rule 30 by the plaintiffs collectively, or by the defendants collectively. Further, the parties may depose any expert witness disclosed by an opposing party pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) without regard to these limitations, but otherwise in accordance with the terms of Rule 30. This modification of the scheduling order shall not alter or amend any of the dates and deadlines in the Scheduling Order, including the May 13, 2022 deadline for completion of all fact discovery. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #311 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jose Garza shall to answer or otherwise respond to the LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #207 is hereby extended to March 11, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #310 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jos Garza shall to answer or otherwise respond to the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #200 is hereby extended to March 14, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #312 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jose Garza shall to answer or otherwise respond to the LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #208 is hereby extended to March 11, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #307 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the State Defendants to designate rebuttal experts and serve on all parties the material required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B) for such rebuttal experts is hereby extended to March 29, 2022. The State Defendants are cautioned that the Court will disfavor any requests to extend the dispositive motion deadline premised on this extension. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #208 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #207 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #200 Amended Complaint by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Barbara S. Nicholas added to party John Creuzot(pty:dft) by John Creuzot.(Nicholas, Barbara)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #125 Scheduling Order, Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott, re #243 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE Designation of Expert Witnesses by Yvonne Ramon (Ramirez, Josephine)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Kim Ogg served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Hardin, John)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Hardin, John)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lisa Wise, re #255 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Armon, Orion)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, re #255 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Longoria, Julia)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott, re #240 MOTION to Dismiss the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton (Sweeten, Patrick)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Mi Familia Vota Plaintiffs' Expert Designations by Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge (Watkins, Elijah)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Pretrial Disclosures Defendant Lisa Wise's Designation of Potential Testifying Experts by Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Designation by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute (Longoria, Julia)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Expert Designation by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Expert Designation by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Fiel Houston, Inc., Houston Area Urban League, JOLT Action, League of Women Voters of Texas, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Organizing Project, The Arc of Texas, William C. Velasquez Institute, Workers Defense Action Fund (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by United States Of America. (Stewart, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #199 Amended Complaint, by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #200 Amended Complaint by Kim Ogg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Eric)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #291 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. No later than March 15, 2022, Defendant Kim Ogg, in her capacity as Harris County District Attorney, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiffs OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, and Workers Defense Action Fund. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #292 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. No later than March 15, 2022, Defendant Kim Ogg, in her capacity as Harris County District Attorney, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Houston Area Urban League, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., The Arc of Texas, Mi Familia Vota, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Paul Rutledge, and Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #200 Amended Complaint by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #207 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #208 Amended Complaint, by Jose Garza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. John Creuzot served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Hardin, John)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Jose Garza served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Hardin, John)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Holmes R. Gary Spencer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15753994) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Holmes, Jennifer)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2-23-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/18/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2022, Appeal Record due by 3/14/2022, (gs)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #288 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jose Garza shall file a response to LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before March 4, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #290 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jose Garza shall file a response to OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before March 7, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Travis County District Attorney Jose Garza shall file a response to LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before March 4, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #285 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Holmes Ciara A. Sisco ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15750860) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, The Arc of Texas. (Holmes, Jennifer)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #283 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Motion Hearing held on 2/23/2022 re #205 MOTION to Compel Production filed by United States Of America (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #243 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Joe Gonzales served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Hardin, John)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #275 Motion entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Plaintiff Houston Justice is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All other Plaintiffs remain a party to this action, and the dismissal of Houston Justice does not affect remaining Plaintiffs' claims against any defendants. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #278 Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Robert D. Green is withdrawn and the appearance of Lisa V. Cubriel of the Bexar County Criminal District Attorney's Office is substituted as counsel for Joe Gonzales and Jacquelyn Callanen in all cases consolidated into this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #205 Motion to Compel entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion is hereby GRANTED. No later than March 31, 2022, State Defendants must produce under protective order updated contents of relevant fields, including the "Card Status" field, from the Texas Department of Public Safety database to the United States. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #240 MOTION to Dismiss the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton (Davis, Lia)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jacque Callanen, Joe Gonzales. (Green, Robert)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Joe Gonzales.(Green, Robert)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ANSWER to #199 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Joe Gonzales(pty:dft) by Joe Gonzales.(Green, Robert)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Houston Justice as a Party by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Kenneth)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Arc of Texas, Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.. Jose Garza served on 2/17/2022, answer due 3/10/2022. (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Summons Issued as to Joe Gonzales. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Summons Issued as to Jose Garza. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Workers Defense Action Fund, OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project. Kim Ogg served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Mirza, Hani)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Summons Issued as to Kim Ogg. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Workers Defense Action Fund, OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project. Jose Garza served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Mirza, Hani)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Summons Issued as to Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Summons Issued as to Yvonne Rosales. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Summons Issued as to John Creuzot. (rg)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, James Lewin, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. Yvonne Rosales served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. (Perales, Nina)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott, re #239 MOTION to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. Joe Gonzales, in his official capacity as Bexar County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. Jose Garza, in his official capacity as Travis County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. Kim Ogg, in her official capacity as Harris County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr., in his official capacity as Hidalgo County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. Yvonne Rosales, in her official capacity as El Paso County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. John Creuzot, in his official capacity as Dallas County District Attorney (Hardin, John)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 GOVT'S REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #205 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Consol Plaintiff United States Of America (Stewart, Michael)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Summons Issued as to Jose Garza, in his official capacity as the Travis County District Attorney. (wg)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- LUPE Transcript of Status Conference)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. Jose Garza re Doc# 199 ) (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition. (rg)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #250 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #203 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by the Young Black Lawyers Organizing Coalition (YBLOC) entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. YBLOC seeks to represent a unique perspective within the universe of civic organizations impacted by SB1--that of lawyers and law students dedicated to protecting and empowering Black voters. Because YBLOC conducts organizing and advocacy in support of its mission in Texas (along with six other states), the Court concludes that YBLOC has a "special interest that justifies [it] having a say." Strasser v. Dooley, 432 F.2d 567, 569 (1st Cir. 1970). The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed amicus brief attached as an exhibit to YBLOCs motion [203-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge, The Arc of Texas, re #239 MOTION to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State of Texass Motion for Rehearing at 1, State v. Stephens, No. PD-1032-20 (Dec. 30, 2021))(Holmes, Jennifer)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A. Holmes Liliana Zaragoza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15706486) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Bar Admission Information)(Holmes, Jennifer)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition, re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Movant Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition (Moye, Veronica)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 STIPULATED ORDER #241 regarding discovery of electronically stored information Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Arc of Texas, Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.. [doc 199] Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #205 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Consol Plaintiff United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defendants' Obj. and Resp. to USA's First RFPs, #2 Exhibit B- Gipson Declaration 2.7.22- Final- Executed, #3 Exhibit C- SB1- Crawford Declaration 2.8.22 - FINAL signed, #4 Exhibit D- 211117 LUPE Transcript of Status Conference, #5 Exhibit E- 20211230 USA's 1st Interrogatories to State Defs)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Arc of Texas, Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc.. Joe Gonzales served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022; Kim Ogg served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Buckley Disorbo on behalf of Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. Attorney Jack Buckley Disorbo added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney Jack Buckley Disorbo added to party STATE OF TEXAS(pty:condft), Attorney Jack Buckley Disorbo added to party John Scott(pty:condft) (Disorbo, Jack)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, James Lewin, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Impact (Perales, Nina)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Status Conference)(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Defendant Lisa Wise's ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint, by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for Entry of Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yun, Jennifer)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION to Dismiss the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Stool, Ben)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, James Lewin, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Impact (Perales, Nina)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Summons Issued as to Jose Garza, Joe Gonzales, Kim Ogg, Yvonne Rosales. (wg)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ranjana Natarajan for ROBERT COTTER ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15682493) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Movant Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Leif)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Stipulated Protective Order)(Freeman, Daniel)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #234 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Defendant Lisa Wise's ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. Travis DA (Cox, Ryan)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. Harris DA (Cox, Ryan)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr for Danielle V. Ahlrich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15674143) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Kenneth)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Yvonne Ramon.(Ramirez, Josephine)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. on [Doc #199] Second Amended Complaint (Broughton, Kenneth)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Nicholas, Barbara)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #227 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott, re #145 MOTION to Dismiss the Federal Government's Claims filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Sweeten, Patrick)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ANSWER to #199 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ANSWER to #207 Amended Complaint, by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #218 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Zack Goldberg for Defendant Lisa Wise is withdrawn and he shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ZACK GOLDBERG by Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Natarajan, Ranjana)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ANSWER to #200 Amended Complaint by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ANSWER to #199 Amended Complaint, by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ANSWER to #200 Amended Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline by United States Of America. (Stewart, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Christopher H. Bell is withdrawn and he shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Christopher Bell, by Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Christopher)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #207 Amended Complaint, #200 Amended Complaint, #208 Amended Complaint, #199 Amended Complaint, by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #212 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for State Defendants to respond to the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #199 and the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #200 is hereby extended to February 8, 2022. The deadline for State Defendants to respond to the LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #207 is extended to February 9, 2022. The deadline for State Defendants to respond to the LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #208 is extended to February 15, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING #210 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file a response no later than February 9, 2022. Any reply must be filed no later than February 16, 2022. The Court hereby SETS a hearing on this motion for Wednesday, February 23, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The Courtroom Deputy will inform the parties of the means by which the hearing will be conducted. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #205 MOTION to Compel Production by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Hearing: #205 MOTION to Compel Production. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #177 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #207 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #206 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motions to Dismiss the LUPE Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #176 and the LULAC Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #177 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Motions to Dismiss have been mooted in light of the filing of the LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #208 and the LULAC Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #207 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Creuzot, Jose Garza, Warren K. Paxton, Yvonne Rosales, STATE OF TEXAS, Michael Scarpello, John Scott, Lisa Wise amending, filed by Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, James Lewin, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Impact.(rg)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #204 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint [204-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #176 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the LUPE Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #208 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #176 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE, et al.'s First Amended Complaint, #177 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC, et al.'s First Amended Complaint by Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (White, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Compel Production by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Stewart, Michael)
January 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Second Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed Order)(Morales-Doyle, Sean)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Young Black Lawyers' Organizing Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Moye, Veronica)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany Sue Bingham on behalf of Isabel Longoria. Attorney Tiffany Sue Bingham added to party Isabel Longoria(pty:condft) (Bingham, Tiffany)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Beeler on behalf of Isabel Longoria. Attorney Christina Marie Beeler added to party Isabel Longoria(pty:condft) (Beeler, Christina)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #182 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #199 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #175 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #200 entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jacque Callanen, Dana DeBeauvoir, Jose Garza, Joe Gonzales, Isabel Longoria, Kim Ogg, Warren K. Paxton, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, John Scott, Lisa Wise, John Creuzot, Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr., Yvonne Rosales amending, filed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas.(rg)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #175 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton (Cox, Ryan)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, re #176 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE, et al.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Perales, Nina)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #177 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC, et al.'s First Amended Complaint filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #194 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint, attached to the motion as Exhibit A [194-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dana DeBeauvoir, Jose Garza, Isabel Longoria, Kim Ogg, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott amending, filed by Workers Defense Action Fund, OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas.(rg)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory W. Abbott, Jacque Callanen, Isabel Longoria, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott, Kim Ogg, Joe Gonzales, Jose Garza amending, filed by Paul Rutledge, Mi Familia Vota, The Arc of Texas, Marlon Lopez, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Marla Lopez.(rg)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #145 MOTION to Dismiss the Federal Government's Claims filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Consol Defendant STATE OF TEXAS (Freeman, Daniel)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 1-11-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/8/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2022, Appeal Record due by 2/2/2022, (gs)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #192 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint, attached to the motion as Exhibit A [192-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #191 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint, attached to the motion as Exhibit A [191-1]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Amend Complaint by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Ryan)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Jennifer)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, William C. Velasquez Institute for proceedings held on 1/11/2022.. (Perales, Nina)***Modified TEXT on 1/14/2022 (dtg).***STATUS CONFERENCE (VIDEO) OF 1/11/2022 BEFORE JUDGE XAVIER RODRIGUEZ.***COURT REPORTER: GIGI SIMCOX.***
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon on Behalf of David Louk ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15607268) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion). Duplicate Filing fee was refunded by Finance on 1/24/2022 (kc).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Orion Armon on Behalf of David Louk ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15607042) by on behalf of Lisa Wise. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armon, Orion)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #166 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial #185 of John Ashcroft's motion for leave to file an amicus brief #171 in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #186 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Lora Spencer shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #167 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial #185 of John Ashcroft's motion for leave to file an amicus brief #171 in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #165 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial #185 of John Ashcroft's motion for leave to file an amicus brief #171 in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #187 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #188 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's order granting Mr. Louk's previous motion #187 to appear pro hac vice in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 1/11/2022. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ,Lora Spencer, by Houston Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spencer, Lora)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING #171 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan V. Cox for Sarah Chen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15602998) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Cox, Ryan)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #172 Motion to Consolidate Cases entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. For the reasons discussed at today's hearing, the motion to consolidate Longoria v. Paxton, No. 5-21-cv-1223 (W.D. Tex.) with La Union del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.) is hereby DENIED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #184 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States Of America, re #172 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott (Paikowsky, Dana)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #180 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund, re #172 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Consol Defendant John Scott, Defendant Warren K. Paxton, Defendant Gregory W. Abbott jointly filed by all private plaintiffs (Cox, Ryan)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (rg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Michael B. Jones ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15593872) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #178 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to the Fact Sheet for Judge Xavier Rodriguez, found on the TXWD website, any brief or memorandum less than 30 pages may be submitted without leave of Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Gregory W. Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party John Scott(pty:condft) (Thompson, William)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Houston Justice Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit November 16, 2021 Hearing Transcript)(Sweeten, Patrick)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION to Dismiss LULAC, et al.'s First Amended Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status Conference Transcript 11-16-21)(Sweeten, Patrick)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss LUPE, et al.'s First Amended Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Status Conference Transcript 11-16-21)(Sweeten, Patrick)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the OCA-Greater Houston Plaintiffs by Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of November 16, 2021 Hearing)(Sweeten, Patrick)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER - Set Motion Hearing for #172 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin [Haley Costello Essig] ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15579725) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by John R. Ashcroft. by John R. Ashcroft. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(rg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Ashcroft by on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen S. Davis by on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rg)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark F. Hearne by on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rg)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Lisa Wise by Lisa Wise (Attachments: #1 Initial Disclosures by Lisa Wise)(Armon, Orion)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin [Marcos Mocine-McQueen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15568912) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by John R. Ashcroft; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500059573. (rg)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Stephen S. Davis; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500059575. (rg)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Mark F. Hearne; Filing fee $100.00, receipt number 500059574. (rg)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Expert Discovery Deadline by United States Of America. (Stewart, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Between the United States of America and Defendants the State of Texas and Secretary of State John Scott by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #159 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin [Noah B. Baron] ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15556846) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #158 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the United States to file a response to the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #145 is hereby extended to January 18, 2022. The deadline for the State Defendants' reply is extended to February 1, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #145 MOTION to Dismiss the Federal Government's Claims by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ANSWER to #139 Amended Complaint, by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Defendant's ANSWER to #140 Amended Complaint by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Defendant's ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ANSWER to #139 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWER to #140 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Nicholas, Barbara)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Nicholas, Barbara)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWER to #136 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Yvonne Ramon.(Ramirez, Josephine)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ANSWER to #137 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss the Federal Government's Claims by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #137 Amended Complaint, #139 Amended Complaint, #140 Amended Complaint, #136 Amended Complaint, by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton, STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #144 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the State Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint is hereby extended to January 5, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal in USCA #21-51145 has been accepted by the 5th Circuit. re #123 Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (dtg)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING #142 Motion regarding the disclosure of privileged information. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Agreed MOTION Regarding the Disclosure of Privileged Information by Gregory W. Abbott, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Filing PLAINTIFFS' JOINT AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURES by La Union Del Pueblo Entero (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURES)(Perales, Nina)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #54 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. In light of the amended complaint at ECF No. 136, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #53 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. In light of the amended complaint at ECF No. 140, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #55 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. In light of the amended complaint at ECF No. 137, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #68 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. On November 30, 2021, the United States of America filed an amended complaint. ECF No. 131. On December 1, 2021, the remaining plaintiffs in these consolidated cases filed amended complaints. ECF Nos. 136, 137, 139. 140. None of these complaints identify Lupe C. Torres as a defendant. Thus, it appears that Lupe C. Torres is no longer a defendant in these cases. Accordingly, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #67 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. In light of the amended complaint at ECF No. 139, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #64 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. In light of the amended complaint at ECF No. 139, this motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE OF TEXAS amending, filed by La Union Del Pueblo Entero.(Perales, Nina)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory W. Abbott, Jacque Callanen, Jose A. Esparza, Isabel Longoria, Warren K. Paxton amending, filed by Paul Rutledge, Mi Familia Vota, The Arc of Texas, Marlon Lopez, Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Marla Lopez.(Olson, Wendy)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Isabel Longoria (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Birring, Sameer)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dana DeBeauvoir, Isabel Longoria, Warren K. Paxton, John Scott amending, filed by Workers Defense Action Fund, OCA-Greater Houston, League of Women Voters of Texas, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project.(Cox, Ryan)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jacque Callanen, Dana DeBeauvoir, Isabel Longoria, Warren K. Paxton, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, John Scott, Lisa Wise amending #1 Complaint., filed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas.(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Amended Initial Disclosures by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Defendants' Initial Disclosures)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Pretrial Disclosures Amended Initial Disclosures by Lupe C. Torres. (Henneke, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Pretrial Disclosures Amended Initial Disclosures by Lisa Wise. (Armon, Orion)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE of Amended Initial Disclosures by United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: US Amended Initial Disclosures)(Freeman, Daniel)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott amending, filed by United States Of America.(Freeman, Daniel)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Attorney Kevin Zen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15484074) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #128 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the State of Texas and Secretary Scott to Complaint filed by the United States is hereby extended to December 3, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee for dates of 11/16/2021. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Gigi Simcox.. (Gore, John)***Modified TEXT on 12/1/2021 (dtg).***TRANSCRIPT IS ALREADY ON FILE IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE.***SEE DOCKET ENTRY #126.***STATUS CONFERENCE OF 11/16/2021.***
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File United States of America's Complaint (consolidated case 5:21-cv-1085) by STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS, John Scott. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party STATE OF TEXAS(pty:condft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party John Scott(pty:condft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 11-16-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gigi Simcox, Telephone number: 210-244-5037, gigi_simcox@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/10/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2022, Appeal Record due by 12/6/2021, (gs)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/5/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2022 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2022, Discovery due by 5/13/2022, Joinder of Parties due by 1/22/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #122 by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-15454561). Attorney John M. Gore added to party Republican National Committee(pty:mov) (Gore, John)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING #57 the Committees' Motion to intervene Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF APPEAL following #123 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed), by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 15454561. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a #(Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 11/16/2021. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(rg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING #43 Public Interest Legal Foundation Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Foundation for Government Accountability. (rg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's order granting Mr. Whitson's previous motion #76 to appear pro hac vice in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #78 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The amicus brief is deemed to have been filed on the date of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial of the Republican Committees' motion to intervene #57 for the reasons stated in open court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #77 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #118 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial of the Public Interest Legal Foundation's motion to intervene #43 for the reasons stated in open court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #119 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial of the Public Interest Legal Foundation's motion to intervene #43 for the reasons stated in open court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez in light of the Court's denial of the Republican Committees' motion to intervene #57 for the reasons stated in open court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andy Taylor for attorney Maureen S. Riordan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15441938) by on behalf of Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Taylor, Andy)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andy Taylor for attorney Kaylan Phillips ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15441931) by on behalf of Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Taylor, Andy)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 APPENDIX by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part V), #2 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part VI), #3 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part VII), #4 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part VIII))(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 APPENDIX to #112 Notice of Filing by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Legislative History: SB 7, Legislative Session 87(R), #2 Legislative History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, 1st Special Session, #3 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part I), #4 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part II), #5 Leg. History: SB 1, Legislative Session 87, Second Special Session (Part III))(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by United States Of America. (Freeman, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Republican National Committee. (Gore, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Joinder by Republican National Committee re #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene (Gore, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Filing Defendants Initial Disclosures by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Defendants Initial Disclosures)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, re #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant National Republican Congressional Committee, Movant Harris County Republican Party, Movant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant National Republican Senatorial Committee (Gore, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee (Gore, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales for Attorney Jason S. Kanterman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15439435) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Isabel Longoria (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Birring, Sameer)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Lupe C. Torres (Henneke, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Michael Scarpello (Stool, Ben)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Initial Disclosures)(Yukevich, Kathryn)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Dana DeBeauvoir (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures)(Nelson, Anthony)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Lisa Wise (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Def. Wise Initial Disclosures)(Armon, Orion)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LUPE Initial Disclosures)(Perales, Nina)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of FILING OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Yvonne Ramon (Ramirez, Josephine)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broughton, Kenneth)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE of Filing Defendant Callanen's Initial Disclosures by Jacque Callanen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Callanen's Initial Disclosures)(Green, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Filing of Initial Disclosures by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund re #96 Order (Attachments: #1 Initial Disclosures)(Cox, Ryan)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Initial Disclosures)(Freeman, Daniel)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER --The parties are hereby ORDERED to file their exchangedinitial disclosures on the public docket, no later than 3:00 p.m. on Monday, November 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan V. Cox Stegemoeller, Patrick ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15432973) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Cox, Ryan)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Friendship-West Baptist Church, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garber, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for the Parties to file their Rule 26(f) Report is extended to Wednesday, November 10, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldox)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File The Parties' Rule 26(f) Report by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hudson, Eric)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Joinder in Opposition to Intervention by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund re #88 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Cox, Ryan)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, re #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant National Republican Congressional Committee, Movant Harris County Republican Party, Movant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant National Republican Senatorial Committee (Ryan, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Joinder by Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion, #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene, #88 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Lyons, Sean)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, re #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant National Republican Congressional Committee, Movant Harris County Republican Party, Movant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant National Republican Senatorial Committee (Broughton, Kenneth)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant National Republican Congressional Committee, Movant Harris County Republican Party, Movant Dallas County Republican Party, Movant National Republican Senatorial Committee (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stewart Whitson by Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rg)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas (Broughton, Kenneth)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Georgina Yeomans for Mohammed Amir Badat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15413223) by on behalf of Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Yeomans, Georgina)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Pretrial Disclosures Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(A) F.R.C.P by Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #64 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Houston Justice, et al., #68 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike the Complaint of La Union Del Pueblo Entero, et al., #54 MOTION to Dismiss , #67 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of Mi Familia, et al. (Freeman, Daniel)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Briefing Deadlines by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broughton, Kenneth)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #82 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Responses to the pending motions to dismiss must be filed no later than November 18, 2021. Any replies must be filed no later than December 3, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Alcantara Harris on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. Attorney Ashley Alcantara Harris added to party League of Women Voters of Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Ashley Alcantara Harris added to party OCA-Greater Houston(pty:conpla), Attorney Ashley Alcantara Harris added to party REVUP-Texas(pty:conpla), Attorney Ashley Alcantara Harris added to party Texas Organizing Project(pty:conpla), Attorney Ashley Alcantara Harris added to party Workers Defense Action Fund(pty:conpla) (Harris, Ashley)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy for Ari Savitzky ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15394930) by on behalf of League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund. (Buser-Clancy, Thomas)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Donna G. Davidson. by Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Davidson, Donna)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donna Garcia Davidson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15389174) by on behalf of Foundation for Government Accountability. (Davidson, Donna)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donna Garcia Davidson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15389054) by on behalf of Foundation for Government Accountability. (Davidson, Donna)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donna Garcia Davidson on behalf of Foundation for Government Accountability. Attorney Donna Garcia Davidson added to party Foundation for Government Accountability(pty:am) (Davidson, Donna)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Public Interest Legal Foundation, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation Joint (Taylor, Andy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Joinder by Dana DeBeauvoir re #52 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Nelson, Anthony)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Gore for Stephen J. Kenny ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15373621) by on behalf of Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Gore, John)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Gore for E. Stewart Crosland ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15373559) by on behalf of Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Gore, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Jacque Callanen(pty:condft) by Jacque Callanen.(Green, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Lisa Wise.(Armon, Orion)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss by Lupe C. Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of Mi Familia, et al. by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Houston Justice, et al. by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M. Gore on behalf of Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. Attorney John M. Gore added to party Dallas County Republican Party(pty:mov), Attorney John M. Gore added to party Harris County Republican Party(pty:mov), Attorney John M. Gore added to party National Republican Congressional Committee(pty:mov), Attorney John M. Gore added to party National Republican Senatorial Committee(pty:mov) (Gore, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Consolidated Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Josephine L. Ramirez added to party Yvonne Ramon(pty:condft) by Yvonne Ramon.(Ramirez, Josephine)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dallas County Republican Party, Harris County Republican Party, National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee. (Gore, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Scarpello.(Nicholas, Barbara)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria.(Birring, Sameer)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Opposed MOTION to Intervene by Harris County Republican Party, Dallas County Republican Party, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Proposed Answer, #5 Proposed Answer)(Gore, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Anthony J. Nelson added to party Dana DeBeauvoir(pty:cd) by Dana DeBeauvoir.(Nelson, Anthony)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of OCA-Greater Houston, et al. by Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Hudson, Eric)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Strike the Complaint of La Union Del Pueblo Entero, et al. by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The appearance of Jessica M. Choi for Plaintiffs La Unin Del Pueblo Entero, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, JOLT Action, William C. Velasquez Institute and Fiel Houston, Inc. is hereby WITHDRAWN and she shall be removed from all service lists pertaining to this action. These Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Julia Longoria, who has already entered her appearance in this matter, and by other attorneys from Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jacque Callanen, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, Lisa Wise, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation Opposition to Public Interest Legal Foundation's Motion to Intervene (Armon, Orion)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Joinder in Opposition by League of Women Voters of Texas, OCA-Greater Houston, REVUP-Texas, Texas Organizing Project, Workers Defense Action Fund re #49 Response in Opposition to Motion, #43 MOTION (Cox, Ryan)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation (Genender, Paul)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation (Broughton, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Joinder by Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge re #47 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Rasich, Marc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeffrey Lamar Clemmons, Delta Sigma Theta Sorority Inc., Houston Area Urban League, Houston Justice, The Arc of Texas, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation (Broughton, Kenneth)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, re #43 MOTION filed by Movant Public Interest Legal Foundation (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Graham White ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15359890) by on behalf of LULAC Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Jessica Choi, by Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Choi, Jessica)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Taylor, Andy)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vote Latino, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, LULAC Texas. Yvonne Ramon served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Hardin, John)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cb)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Morales-Doyle for Jasleen K. Singh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15302528) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morales-Doyle, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Rutledge, Mi Familia Vota, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez as to Gregory W. Abbott. Waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021; Jose A. Esparza. Waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021; Warren K. Paxton. Waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Courtney M. Hostetler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301692) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Ronald A. Fein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301682) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Ben Clements ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301675) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons John C. Bonifaz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301654) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Elijah M. Watkins ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301641) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Laura E. Rosenbaum ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301626) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Marc T. Rasich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301618) by on behalf of Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Mi Familia Vota, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Michael Lyons Wendy J. Olson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15301531) by on behalf of Mi Familia Vota, Marla Lopez, Marlon Lopez, Paul Rutledge. (Lyons, Sean)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion to Consolidate Cases. SA-21-CV-848, SA-21-CV-920, A-21-CV-780 and A-21-CV-786 are MEMBER CASES and will be CONSOLIDATED under LEAD CASE - SA-21-CV-844-XR. ALL PLEADINGS ARE TO BE FILED INTO THE LEAD CASE.All served Defendants shall file an answer on or before October 25, 2021. An initial pretrial conference shall be conducted on November 16, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference; Discovery plan and scheduling order, no later than November 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Lupe C. Torres answer due 10/25/2021. (rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (XR)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lupe C. Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henneke, Robert)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE Regarding Pending Motion to Consolidate by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton (White, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (XR)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Gregory W. Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Warren K. Paxton(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lewin, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Isabel Longoria, Texas Impact. Lupe C. Torres served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Perales, Nina)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lewin, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Isabel Longoria, Texas Impact. Jose A. Esparza served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Perales, Nina)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Gregory W. Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, Warren K. Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Orig. Complaint (1:21-cv-780), #2 Ex. B - Orig. Complaint (5:21-cv-848), #3 Ex. C - Orig. Complaint (1:21-cv-786), #4 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lewin, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Isabel Longoria, Texas Impact. Warren K. Paxton served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Perales, Nina)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lewin, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Friendship-West Baptist Church, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Isabel Longoria, Texas Impact. Gregory W. Abbott served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Perales, Nina)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #14 #15 #16 #17 #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Berde,Alexander P. Cohen,Patrick A. Berry,Andrew B. Garber,Eliza Sweren-Becker for Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nina Perales on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute (Perales, Nina)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan for Eliza Sweren-Becker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15199840) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan for Andrew B. Garber ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15199807) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan for Patrick A. Berry ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15199756) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan for Alexander P. Cohen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15199697) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan for Matthew Berde ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15198666) by on behalf of Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, James Lewin, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Elizabeth)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rebecca L. Martin for Fiel Houston, Inc.,Rebecca L. Martin for JOLT Action,Rebecca L. Martin for La Union Del Pueblo Entero,Rebecca L. Martin for Mexican American Bar Association of Texas,Rebecca L. Martin for Southwest Voter Registration Education Project,Rebecca L. Martin for Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education,Rebecca L. Martin for William C. Velasquez Institute. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #4 #5 #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Christopher H. Bell, Jessica M. Choi, Michael C. Keats for JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute, Fiel Houston, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney is hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales Motion for Admission PHV of Rebecca L. Martin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15192607) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Lupe C. Torres. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Warren K. Paxton. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jose A. Esparza. (rg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gregory W. Abbott. (rg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales Motion for Admission PHV of Jessica M. Choi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15191295) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales Motion for Admission PHV of Christopher H. Bell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15191293) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales Motion for Admission PHV of Michael C. Keats ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15191289) by on behalf of Fiel Houston, Inc., JOLT Action, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fiel Houston, Inc., Friendship-West Baptist Church, Isabel Longoria, JOLT Action, James Lewin, La Union Del Pueblo Entero, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education, Texas Impact, The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma, William C. Velasquez Institute. (Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15188447). No Summons requested at this time, filed by La Union Del Pueblo Entero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perales, Nina)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Union Del Pueblo Entero, et al v. Gregory W. Abbott, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Union Del Pueblo Entero
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Kenneth E. Broughton, Jr.
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Represented By: Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friendship-West Baptist Church
Represented By: Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan
Represented By: Paul R. Genender
Represented By: Sean Morales-Doyle
Represented By: Alexander P. Cohen
Represented By: Andrew B. Garber
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Jasleen K. Singh
Represented By: Matthew Berde
Represented By: Patrick A. Berry
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Robyn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Anti-Defamation League Austin, Southwest, and Texoma
Represented By: Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan
Represented By: Paul R. Genender
Represented By: Sean Morales-Doyle
Represented By: Alexander P. Cohen
Represented By: Andrew B. Garber
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Jasleen K. Singh
Represented By: Matthew Berde
Represented By: Patrick A. Berry
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Robyn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Impact
Represented By: Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan
Represented By: Paul R. Genender
Represented By: Sean Morales-Doyle
Represented By: Alexander P. Cohen
Represented By: Andrew B. Garber
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Jasleen K. Singh
Represented By: Matthew Berde
Represented By: Patrick A. Berry
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Robyn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mexican American Bar Association of Texas
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Hispanics Organized for Political Education
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOLT Action
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Velasquez Institute
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Longoria
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lewin
Represented By: Christian Dashaun Menefee
Represented By: Jonathan Gabriel Chaim Fombonne
Represented By: Sameer Singh Birring
Represented By: Sean Morales-Doyle
Represented By: Alexander P. Cohen
Represented By: Andrew B. Garber
Represented By: Eliza Sweren-Becker
Represented By: Jasleen K. Singh
Represented By: Matthew Berde
Represented By: Patrick A. Berry
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Elizabeth Yvonne Ryan
Represented By: Paul R. Genender
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Robyn Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiel Houston, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Christopher H. Bell
Represented By: Jessica M. Choi
Represented By: Julia Renee Longoria
Represented By: Michael C. Keats
Represented By: Rebecca L. Martin
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Jason S. Kanterman
Represented By: Kevin Zhen
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Represented By: Kenneth Parreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Wendy J. Olson
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Marc T. Rasich
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Bradley R. Prowant
Represented By: Mark L. Bieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Lopez
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Wendy J. Olson
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Marc T. Rasich
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Bradley R. Prowant
Represented By: Mark L. Bieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Lopez
Represented By: Wendy J. Olson
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Marc T. Rasich
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Bradley R. Prowant
Represented By: Mark L. Bieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rutledge
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Wendy J. Olson
Represented By: Courtney M. Hostetler
Represented By: Elijah M. Watkins
Represented By: John Bonifaz
Represented By: Marc T. Rasich
Represented By: Ronald A. Fein
Represented By: Sean Michael Lyons
Represented By: Danielle V. Ahlrich
Represented By: Victor Genecin
Represented By: Bradley R. Prowant
Represented By: Mark L. Bieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Esparza
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe C. Torres
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Represented By: Robert E Henneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Abbott
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Jack Buckley Disorbo
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: J. Aaron Barnes
Represented By: Kathleen Hunker
Represented By: Christopher D. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren K. Paxton
Represented By: Eric A. Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: Jack Buckley Disorbo
Represented By: