Canales v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Ramiro Canales
Respondent: Rick Thaler, Ruth E. Trice, Rolando Cerda, Jr, Helene Noutemo, Stacy G. Steele and Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2021cv00862
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion for Discovery Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Production of Documents by Ramiro Canales. (mgr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Ramiro Canales. (mgr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Ramiro Canales. (mgr)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500059088 (mgr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENT in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ramiro Canales. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(mgr)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bobby Lumpkin amending #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus., filed by Ramiro Canales.(mgr)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order DISMISSING as MOOT #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Petitioner's request for more time has already been granted (ECF No. 4). Petitioner's supplemental briefing, along with either the $5 filing fee or a properly supported IFP application, are due October 13, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg5)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Ramiro Canales. (mgr)
September 21, 2021 Mailed Order (doc #4)and Application for IFP to Petitioner. (mgr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner has until Wednesday, October 13, 2021, to either: (1) submit therequired filing fee of $5.00, or (2) file a completed application to proceed IFP together with an IFP data sheet certified by one of the officers in the law library, for this case to proceed. A TDCJ trust fund account statement should be provided to Petitioner by the law library at the unit where Petitioner is incarcerated. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to Ramiro Canales. (nm)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Ramiro Canales. (nm)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ramiro Canales. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
September 10, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (nm)
September 10, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO CHIEF JUDGE ORLANDO L. GARCIA. (nm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canales v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramiro Canales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rick Thaler
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ruth E. Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rolando Cerda, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Helene Noutemo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stacy G. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?