11578243 Canada, Inc., et al v. Bykowski
Plaintiff: 11578243 Canada, Inc., also known as d/b/a BlackOxygen Organics, d, BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc., Marc Saint-Onge and Carlo Garibaldi
Defendant: David Bykowski
Case Number: 5:2021cv00880
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Saint-Onge, 11578243 Canada, Inc.,, Carlo Garibaldi, BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc.. David Bykowski served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Kugler, C.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Substitute Service-- Plaintiffs may serve Defendant by leaving a true copy of the summons and complaint with anyone over sixteen years of age at 16465 Henderson Pass, Apt. 1314, San Antonio, Texas 78232, with additional service by first class regular mail. Alternatively, Plaintiffs may serve Defendant by leaving a true copy of the summons and complaint attached to the door of 16465 Henderson Pass, Apt. 1314, San Antonio, Texas 78232, with additional service by first class regular mail. Plaintiffs must promptly file proof of service upon completion. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiffs' Motion for Substituted Service by BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc., Carlo Garibaldi, Marc Saint-Onge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kugler, C.)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER-- Accordingly, Plaintiffs must continue their efforts to effectuate service. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (bc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Advisory To The Court Regarding Plaintiff's Rule 4.1 Service Attempt by BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cook, Andrea)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Bykowski. (bc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 11578243 Canada, Inc.,, BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc., Carlo Garibaldi, Marc Saint-Onge. (Kugler, C.)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by 11578243 Canada, Inc.,, BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc., Carlo Garibaldi, Marc Saint-Onge. Summons in a Civil Action (Kugler, C.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Comlaint against All Defendants amending, filed by Marc Saint-Onge, 11578243 Canada, Inc.,, Carlo Garibaldi, BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Exhibit)(Kugler, C.)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER-- Plaintiffs are therefore ORDERED to file an amended Complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of the parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity, no later than September 24, 2021.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Appendix to Complaint by C Brenton Kugler. (Kugler, C.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15232642), filed by C Brenton Kugler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Kugler, C.)
September 16, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc)
September 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 11578243 Canada, Inc., et al v. Bykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 11578243 Canada, Inc., also known as d/b/a BlackOxygen Organics
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Cook
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: d
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Cook
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlackOxygen Organics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Cook
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Saint-Onge
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Cook
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Garibaldi
Represented By: Andrea Elizabeth Cook
Represented By: C. Brenton Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?