Cargo Partnership v. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cargo Partnership
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00884
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Orlando L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2023 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/23/2023 9:30AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/7/2022, ADR Mediation Completed by 10/21/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2022, Discovery due by 8/26/2022, Motions due by 9/23/2022,. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Scheduling Recommendations (Agreed) by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Kemp, Patrick)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Kemp, Patrick)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Cargo Partnership. (Rogiers, Jacob)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND ADVIORY - ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify he Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg)
September 17, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 17, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rg)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Wall, Robert)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15235881), filed by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Kemp, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargo Partnership v. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cargo Partnership
Represented By: Jacob S. Rogiers
Represented By: Marco Dax Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Kemp
Represented By: Robert Glen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?