Jimenez v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Jimenez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00893
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 500058955 (rg)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT that the Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ECF No. 1).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions, if any, are DENIED ASMOOT, a CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY WILL NOT ISSUE in this case, and thiscase and the new companion case are now CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Anthony Jimenez; the Court construes Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as a Motion to Vacate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall open a companion civil case for this matter, in keeping with its practices for docketing new motions to vacate pursuant to 28U.S.C. 2255 and shall file a copy of this Order and Judgment in the new cause. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent Mr. Jimenez seeks to set aside his conviction and/or sentence, his motion is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of jurisdiction and a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Motions pending, if any, are also DISMISSED, and this case and the new companion case are CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Anthony Jimenez. (rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order,Petitioner shall either pay the filing fee or submit a request to proceed IFP on the approved form, along with a current history of his inmate trust fund account. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (ifp application mailed to petitioner)(rg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Mark Anthony Jimenez. (dtg)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mark Anthony Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtg)
September 13, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)
September 13, 2021 THIS CASE HAS BEEN DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?