Dylan Raines v. GT Express, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Raines
Defendant: GT Express Inc., Laurah M Wilkinson and Laurah M. Wilkinson
Case Number: 5:2021cv00904
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/11/2022, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/21/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2022, Discovery due by 8/29/2022, Joinder of Parties due by 4/27/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2022. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad: InitialPretrial Conference held on 11/18/2021. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ftr gold.)(rg)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order WITHDRAWING #7 Motion for More Definite Statement entered by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. This motion is WITHDRAWN as stated by counsel at the Initial Pretrial Conference held on November 18, 2021. Such withdrawal is without prejudice to raising related issues later in the case, including by way of motion for summary judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (HJB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by GT Express Inc., Laurah M. Wilkinson. (Fuentes, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by GT Express Inc., Laurah M. Wilkinson . (Fuentes, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Dylan Raines. (Allan, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 Scheduling Recommendations by Dylan Raines. (Allan, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant Laurah M. Wilkinson's Original ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Laurah M. Wilkinson.(Fuentes, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Dylan Raines, re #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant GT Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allan, William)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Defendants are DIRECTED to file an advisory with the District Clerk, onor before October 19, 2021, indicating whether or not they elect to consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 10/19/2021). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant GT Express, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition by GT Express Inc..(Fuentes, Robert)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 ***MOTION HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO GAVEL ORDER FILED ON 11/18/2021*** MOTION for More Definite Statement by GT Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Fuentes, Robert) Modified on 11/18/2021 (rg).
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Dylan Raines. (Allan, William)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC NITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENE (Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2021 1:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for pretrial proceedings including any requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within thirty days of the date of this order as the defendant has already appeared. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Court Advisory Concerning Discovery. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (rg)
September 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg)
September 21, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (rg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GT Express Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15248830), filed by GT Express Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Fuentes, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dylan Raines v. GT Express, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Raines
Represented By: William N. Allan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT Express Inc.
Represented By: Robert Fuentes
Represented By: Dennis O'Neal Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurah M Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurah M. Wilkinson
Represented By: Dennis O'Neal Moore
Represented By: Robert Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?