Wyatt v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Freddy Wyatt
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Bryan Aniekwena
Case Number: 5:2021cv00960
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER --DENYING re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Freddy Wyatt, DENYING #2 Motion to Dismiss filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Bryan Aniekwena as a party in this case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Valdez, Robert)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND by Freddy Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Perry)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Valdez, Robert)
October 8, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc)
October 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) and Rule 9(B) by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valdez, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15315563), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Wyatt
Represented By: Perry J. Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Aniekwena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?