WEDGEWORTH v. DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD WEDGEWORTH
Defendant: DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00976
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLIFFORD WEDGEWORTH as to DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.. Waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Poncio, Adam)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.. (mgr)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CLIFFORD WEDGEWORTH. (Poncio, Adam)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15328452). No Summons requested at this time, filed by CLIFFORD WEDGEWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poncio, Adam)
October 13, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cd)
October 13, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEDGEWORTH v. DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD WEDGEWORTH
Represented By: Alan Braun
Represented By: Adam Poncio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT 2 EMERGENCY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?