Gentry et al v. Amino Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gentry and Brian Hussey
Defendant: Amino Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv01064
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Amino Transport, Inc., re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Amino Transport, Inc. (Goodman, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kimberly Gentry, Brian Hussey, re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Amino Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartry, Allison)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 4:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amino Transport, Inc.. (Millner, Eric)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 APPENDIX to #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amino Transport, Inc. . (Millner, Eric)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amino Transport, Inc.. (Millner, Eric)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Gentry, Brian Hussey. Amino Transport, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Hartry, Allison)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad for dispositionof all non-dispositive pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (rg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amino Transport, Inc. (bc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kimberly Gentry, Brian Hussey. (Hartry, Allison)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15386629), filed by Kimberly Gentry, Brian Hussey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gentry Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Hussey Consent to Join, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartry, Allison)
October 29, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (bc)
October 29, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry et al v. Amino Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gentry
Represented By: Lawrence Morales, II
Represented By: Allison Sarah Hartry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hussey
Represented By: Lawrence Morales, II
Represented By: Allison Sarah Hartry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amino Transport, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Goodman
Represented By: Eric J. Millner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?