McFarland v. RND Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ken McFarland
Defendant: RND Hospitality, LLC and Rekha Sadani
Case Number: 5:2021cv01078
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/21/2022, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. All parties are required to appear by Zoom for the conference.). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rg)
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Justin Allen Fischer added to party RND Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Allen Fischer added to party Rekha Sadani(pty:dft) by RND Hospitality, LLC, Rekha Sadani.(Fischer, Justin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RND Hospitality, LLC, Rekha Sadani. (wg)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ken McFarland. (Scalise, Charles)
November 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
November 3, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Ken McFarland. (Scalise, Charles)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15403558). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ken McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scalise, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. RND Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken McFarland
Represented By: Charles L. Scalise
Represented By: Daniel B. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RND Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Justin Allen Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rekha Sadani
Represented By: Justin Allen Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?