Baptiste v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Marc J Baptiste
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00361
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney
Referring Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6532 IRS: Refund of Tax Penalty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc J Baptiste. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Kennedy, Kevin)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marc J Baptiste, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mgr)
April 14, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr)
April 14, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marc J Baptiste. (Kennedy, Kevin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15925515), filed by Marc J Baptiste. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptiste v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc J Baptiste
Represented By: Kevin Philip Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?