Washington v. Rayford et al
Plaintiff: David Lee Washington
Defendant: Phonso J. Rayford, Vernet A. Davis, Jr, Roger L. Boyd, Mrs. FNU Pena and Mrs. FNU Cortez
Case Number: 5:2022cv00890
Filed: August 4, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by David Lee Washington. (nm)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING IFP and DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lee Washington. (nm)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter to David Lee Washington. (dtg)
August 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lee Washington. (dtg)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David Lee Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Cover Letter, #3 Copy of Envelope)(dtg)
August 4, 2022 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JASON K. PULLIAM. (dtg)
August 4, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Rayford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phonso J. Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernet A. Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. FNU Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. FNU Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?