Calhoun v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Dean Edward Calhoun
Respondent: Warden FNU Delap, Ken Paxton and Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2022cv01185
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason K Pulliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter of Explanation for Disability-Mental from Dean Edward Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Copy of Envelope)(nm)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 SHCR-06 WRIT RECEIVED 12-27-2016, #2 SHCR-06 MISC DOCUMENT 12-29-2016, #3 SHCR-06 MISC DOCUMENT 2-9-2017, #4 SHCR-06 ACTION TAKEN 2-1-2017, #5 SHCR-07 WRIT RECEIVED 12-27-2016, #6 SHCR-07 MISC DOCUMENT 2-9-2017, #7 SHCR-07 MISC DOCUMENT 2-9-2017(2), #8 SHCR-07 MISC DOCUMENT 2-9-2017(3), #9 SHCR-07 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 2-1-2017, #10 SHCR-08 WRIT RECEIVED OR-CER 1-22-2018, #11 SHCR-08 ACTION TAKEN OR-CER 2-7-2018, #12 SHCR-09 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 04-30-2019, #13 SHCR-09 MISC DOCUMENT 8-1-2019, #14 SHCR-09 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 7-3-2019, #15 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part1, #16 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part2, #17 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part3, #18 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part4, #19 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part5, #20 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part6, #21 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part7, #22 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part8, #23 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part9, #24 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part10, #25 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part11, #26 SHCR-10 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 08-16-2019_Part12, #27 SHCR-10 MISC DOCUMENT 9-5-2019, #28 SHCR-10 ORDER ISSUED REMAND 9-11-2019, #29 SHCR-10_ORDER 9-11-2019, #30 SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019SH69_SHCR-10_MISC DOCUMENT 10-3-2019, #31 SHCR-10 MISC DOCUMENT 2-18-2020, #32 SHCR-10 SUPP RECD WRIT 02-14-2020_Part1, #33 SHCR-10 SUPP RECD WRIT 02-14-2020_Part2, #34 SHCR-10 SUPP RECD WRIT 02-14-2020_Part3, #35 SHCR-10_ORDER 03-11-2020, #36 SHCR-10 ACTION TAKEN 3-11-2020)(Abell, Katherine)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 SHCR-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 10-3-2014, #2 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 10-2-2014, #3 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 10-8-2014, #4 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 11-3-2014, #5 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 10-30-2014, #6 SHCR-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 10-22-2014, #7 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 11-26-2014, #8 SHCR-01 MISC DOCUMENT 10-7-2015, #9 SHCR-02 WRIT RECEIVED 12-8-2014, #10 SHCR-02 MISC DOCUMENT 2-24-2015, #11 SHCR-02 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 1-14-2015, #12 SHCR-03 WRIT RECEIVED 2-25-2015, #13 SHCR-03 MISC DOCUMENT 3-23-2015, #14 SHCR-03 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 4-22-2015, #15 SHCR-03 MISC DOCUMENT 5-5-2015, #16 SHCR-03 MISC DOCUMENT 8-24-2016, #17 SHCR-04 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 9-12-2016, #18 SHCR-04 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 9-28-2016, #19 SHCR-05 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 9-29-2016, #20 SHCR-05 ORDER ISSUED REMAND 11-9-2016, #21 SHCR-05_ORDER 11-09-16, #22 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 11-22-2016, #23 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 2-9-2017, #24 SHCR-05 SUPP RECD WRIT 5-5-2017, #25 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 5-22-2017, #26 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 5-23-2017, #27 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 6-5-2017, #28 SHCR-05 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 6-12-2017, #29 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 6-19-2017, #30 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 6-21-2017, #31 SHCR-05 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 7-12-2017, #32 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 8-8-2017, #33 SHCR-05 ORDER ISSUED REMAND 9-13-2017, #34 SHCR-05_ORDER 09-13-17, #35 SHCR-05 SUPP RECD WRIT 9-25-2017, #36 SHCR-05 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 10-18-2017, #37 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 11-27-2017, #38 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 11-7-2018, #39 SHCR-05 MISC DOCUMENT 1-25-2019)(Abell, Katherine)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 1 RR, #2 2 RR, #3 3 RR, #4 4 RR, #5 5 RR Part 1, #6 5 RR Part 2, #7 5 RR Part 3, #8 CR Part1, #9 CR Part2, #10 CR Part3, #11 CR Part4, #12 CR Part5, #13 CR Part6, #14 CR Part7, #15 CR Part8, #16 CR Part9, #17 CR Part10)(Abell, Katherine)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bobby Lumpkin.(Abell, Katherine)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Davis Abell on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin. Attorney Katherine Davis Abell added to party Bobby Lumpkin(pty:res) (Abell, Katherine)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dean Edward Calhoun. (nm)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO ANSWER PETITION. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee received in the amount of $5, receipt number 1374 (nm)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER--It is therefore ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, Petitioner must submit to the Court either the required filing fee of $5.00 or a completed application to proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER--It is therefore ORDERED that Petitioners 2254 petition (ECF No. 1) shall be severed as follows: Petitioners claims challenging his conviction in cause No. CR2010-216 for assaulting a family member shall remain in the instant case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to open a new case for Petitioners claims regarding his conviction in cause No. CR2016-293 for bail jumping and failure to appear. This new case shall also be assigned to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Dean Edward Calhoun. (dtg)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dean Edward Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Cover Letter, #3 Copy of Envelope)(dtg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/31/2022) (dtg).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (dtg)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE PULLIAM. (dtg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dean Edward Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FNU Delap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Katherine Davis Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?