Hawes v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Richard Vonzell Hawes
Respondent: Warden FNU Almonza and Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2022cv01219
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Richard Vonzell Hawes. (nm)
November 17, 2022 Copy of DE #3 and blank IFP form mailed to plaintiff. (nm)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER--It is therefore ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, petitioner must submit to the Court either the required filing fee of $5.00 or a completed application to proceed IFP. If the petitioner submits an IFP application, it must include a current institutional trust fund account statement showing deposits and balances to petitioners institutional account for the previous six months. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (nm)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Richard Vonzell Hawes. (bt)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richard Vonzell Hawes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of envelope)(bt)
November 4, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer. (bt)
November 4, 2022 THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawes v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Vonzell Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FNU Almonza
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?