Tello v. Rayford
Plaintiff: Gilberto Tello
Defendant: J. Rayford, R. Boyd, Sgt. Davis, Lt. C. J. Krist, Sgt. Giron, Sgt. Ochala, Sgt. Twumasi, Officer Ramos, M. Sifuentes, S. M. Bradley, E. Rodriguez, Ms Hernandez, Vega, Detention Officer Lozano and Picket
Case Number: 5:2022cv01299
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINAL JUDGMENT--IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Gilbert Tellos Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Courts December 6, 2022 Order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Tellos Complaint (ECF No. 21) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Courts December 6, 2022 Order. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
January 17, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #36 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
January 12, 2023 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #34 Order on Motion for Discovery, #30 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #29 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
January 6, 2023 Filing 37 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Clarification Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
January 3, 2023 Filing 35 Pro Se MOTION to Clarify by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING #33 Motion for Discovery Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
December 19, 2022 Filing 33 PRO SE MOTION for Discovery by Gilberto Tello. (bc)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING #29 Motion to Amend Complaint; DISMISSING #30 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
December 9, 2022 Filing 31 Opposition to Motions by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
December 9, 2022 Filing 30 Pro Se MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
December 9, 2022 Filing 29 Pro Se MOTION to Amend Complaint by Gilberto Tello. (nm)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Tello shall either pay the filing fee or submit a signed Application to Proceed IFP, along with a current six (6) month history of his inmate trust fund account. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (nm)
December 5, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
December 5, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (nm)
December 5, 2022 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of California; Case Number 3:22-cv-06050.
December 5, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Texas (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/2/22. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Without Restraints filed by Gilberto Tello. Responses due by 12/27/2022. Replies due by 1/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 Exhibit - Offender Grievance Form filed by Gilberto Tello. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 23 Letter dated 11/10/2022 from Gilberto Tello. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gilberto Tello. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 COMPLAINT against J. Rayford, R. Boyd, Davis, C. J. Krist, Giron, Ochala, Twumasi, Ramos, M. Sifuentes, S. M. Bradley, E. Rodriguez, Hernandez, Vega, Lozano, Picket (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 20 Received Document by Gilberto Tello. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 19 Letter dated 11/05/22 from Gilberto Tello. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 10, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 16 Motions and Proposed Orders by Gilberto Tello. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Mistrial filed by Gilberto Tello.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 14 Letter dated 10/31/2022 from Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 Motions and Proposed Order filed by Gilberto Tello. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION in Limine filed by Gilberto Tello.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery filed by Gilberto Tello.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE re list of defendants by Gilberto Tello (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gilberto Tello.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 Letter dated 10/28/2022 from Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 Letter dated 10/30/22 from Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Letter dated 10/30/2022 from Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 Letter dated 10/22/2022 from Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 17, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/21/2022. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 11/21/2022. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 Defending Statement filed by Gilberto Tello. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tello v. Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Tello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rayford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. C. J. Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ochala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Twumasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sifuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. M. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detention Officer Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Picket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?