Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC et al v. H.E.B., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC and E. A.
Defendant: H.E.B., Inc. and H.E.B. PPO Plan
Case Number: 5:2023cv00034
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (nm)
March 2, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Neil, Paul)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (btlc)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Aviva Grumet-Morris ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17097986) by on behalf of H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (nm)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Fred Biery no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (nm)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint ; H.E.B. PPO Plan answer due 2/17/2023; H.E.B., Inc. answer due 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (nm)
January 31, 2023 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party H.E.B. PPO Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party H.E.B., Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. H.E.B. PPO Plan served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023. (O'Neil, Paul)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. H.E.B., Inc. served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023. (O'Neil, Paul)
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to H.E.B. PPO Plan, H.E.B., Inc.. (mgr)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. to H-E-B PPO PLAN (O'Neil, Paul)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. to H.E.B., INC (O'Neil, Paul)
January 10, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
January 10, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (nm)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. (Hollaway, Thomas)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16935510). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hollaway, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC et al v. H.E.B., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windmill Wellness Ranch LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Hollaway
Represented By: Paul Matthew O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A.
Represented By: Paul Matthew O'Neil
Represented By: Thomas D. Hollaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E.B., Inc.
Represented By: Aviva Grumet-Morris
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E.B. PPO Plan
Represented By: Aviva Grumet-Morris
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?