Krueger v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Kent Anthony Krueger
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 5:2024cv00418
Filed: April 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: Copies of Petition #1, and Orders Doc#3 & 5 were mailed to the Petitioners new address listed on his recent filing. Duncan Unit, Diboll, Texas. (wg)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Kent Anthony Krueger. (wg)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Change of Address by Kent Anthony Krueger (wg)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kent Anthony Krueger (wg)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING re #4 MOTION Extension of Time to Pay the $5.00 Filing Fee re #3 Order, filed by Kent Anthony Krueger,Petitioner may file his amended 2254 petition and pay the $5 filing fee on or before Tuesday, September 10, 2024. Petitioner's request for a copy of his original application for habeas corpus relief is also GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the following to petitioner at the address shown on the Court's docket sheet: (1) this Order, (2) the Court's previous Order dated April 23, 2024 (ECF No. 3), and (3) petitioner's original federal habeas application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (ECF No. 1). Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: Copies of the Petitioner's Orig. Habeas Corpus, Orders # 3 & 5, and copy of Docket Sheet forwarded to the Petitioner's current listed address. (wg)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pro-Se MOTION Extension of Time to Pay the $5.00 Filing Fee re #3 Order, by Kent Anthony Krueger. (wg)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED, that, within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, petitionermust clarify his intention in this Court by either: (1) withdrawing the instant 2254 application for habeas corpus (ECF No. 1) as it relates to the revocation of his parole in December 2020 by filing a Notice of Withdrawal, or (2) filing an amended 2254 application for habeas corpus on the forms tobe provided so that the amended application clearly and concisely states his allegations and relief sought. The Clerk of the Court shall forward to petitioner the correct forms for filing a federal habeas application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kent Anthony Krueger. it is ORDERED that petitioner must either: (1) submit the required filing fee of $5.00 along with the amended application, or (2) file a completed IFP application along with a current institutional trust fund account statement showing deposits and balances to petitioners institutionalaccount for the previous six months. The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward petitioner this Courts standard IFP application. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Opening Letter to Kent Anthony Krueger. (vl)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kent Anthony Krueger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope) ***Per Court Order Docket Enty 3 Case number 5:24-CV-00396-FB.***(vl)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. (vl)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (vl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kent Anthony Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?