Ussery v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Randi Ussery
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Counter-Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Counter-Defendant: Randi Ussery
Case Number: 5:2024cv00772
Filed: July 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fred Biery
Referring Judge: Richard B Farrer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal - ERISA
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2024 Filing 11 Scheduling Recommendations by Plaintiff and by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
September 10, 2024 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Plaintiff and by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
September 10, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN PRETRIAL MATTERS, ( Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2024 2:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
August 6, 2024 Filing 7 Scheduling Recommendations by Plaintiff and by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
July 18, 2024 Filing 5 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the appearance of any defendant.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr)
July 16, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Davidoff, Bill)
July 16, 2024 Filing 2 Original ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Randi Ussery by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Davidoff, Bill)
July 15, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr)
July 15, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr)
July 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18983213), filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Matters, #2 Exhibit B - List of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidoff, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ussery v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Ussery
Represented By: Thomas Newton Cammack, III
Represented By: Taylor Woodson Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Randi Ussery
Represented By: Thomas Newton Cammack, III
Represented By: Taylor Woodson Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?