Mosley v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Arementa Mosley
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv00938
Filed: August 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wills, Linda)
September 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 10/11/2024. (wg)
September 16, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wills, Linda)
September 16, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANYS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT)(Wills, Linda)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant to Answer is hereby extended to October 11, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cwlc)
August 26, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (wg)
August 22, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
August 22, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
August 22, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Arementa Mosley. (Svetlik, Erin)
August 22, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Arementa Mosley. (Svetlik, Erin)
August 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19134326), filed by Arementa Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Svetlik, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arementa Mosley
Represented By: Erin Jane Svetlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?