TransPecos Banks, SSB v. Luevano
Plaintiff: TRANSPECOS BANKS, SSB
Defendant: Moses D. Luevano
Case Number: 5:2025cv00050
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Henry J Bemporad
Referring Judge: Fred Biery
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2025 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Moses D. Luevano.(Reyes, Shellie)
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TransPecos Banks, SSB (Saiter, Cynthia)
January 29, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia Lyons Saiter on behalf of TransPecos Banks, SSB. Attorney Cynthia Lyons Saiter added to party TransPecos Banks, SSB(pty:pla) (Saiter, Cynthia)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2025 1:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (vl)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
January 15, 2025 Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vl)
January 15, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad. (vl)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Moses D. Luevano Defendant's Notice of Removal (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19666554), filed by Moses D. Luevano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reyes, Shellie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TransPecos Banks, SSB v. Luevano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPECOS BANKS, SSB
Represented By: Cynthia Lyons Saiter
Represented By: John Ross Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses D. Luevano
Represented By: Shellie Renee Reyes
Represented By: Tiffanie Stegall Clausewitz
Represented By: Nicholas Adam Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?