MV3 Partners LLC v. Best Buy Stores, LP, et al.
Plaintiff: MV3 Partners LLC
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, BestBuy.com, LLC and Best Buy Texas.com, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv00374
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan - Lisa M. Mandrusiak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11771263) by on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, Best Buy Texas.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Milvenan, Richard)
February 15, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan - Michael D. West ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11771196) by on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, Best Buy Texas.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Milvenan, Richard)
February 15, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. Milvenan -Alexander J. Hadjis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11771136) by on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, LP, Best Buy Texas.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Milvenan, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 Pro Hac Vice Letter for Michael D. West. (mc5)
February 13, 2019 Filing 32 Pro Hac Vice Letter for Lisa M. Mandrusiak. (mc5)
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Alexander J. Hadjis. (mc5)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion to Substitute Parties Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
February 12, 2019 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Parties by MV3 Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, J.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C. Miller for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcus A. Barber for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John W. Downing for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darcy L. Jones for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan K. Waldrop for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack Shaw for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gurtej Singh for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rodney R. Miller for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jgb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heather S. Kim for MV3 Partners LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
January 25, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Best Buy Co., Inc. answer due 2/25/2019. (lad)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Best Buy Co., Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for an Extension to Answer or Otherwise Respond entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The Court has considered Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension until February 25, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff MV3 Partners LLC's Complaint for patent infringement and finds it should be GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. to answer or otherwise respond is extended until February 25, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received in the amount of $100, receipt number 600024222 for Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee for Jonathan K. Waldrop, Darcy L. Jones, Daniel C. Miller, Marcus A. Barber, John W. Downing, Rodney R. Miller, Heather S. Kim, Jack Shaw, Gurtej Singh. (mc5)
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Gurtej Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Heather S. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Jack Shaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Daniel C. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Marcus A. Barber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for John W. Downing to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Darcy L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Jonathan K. Waldrop to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Rodney R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. (klw)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MV3 Partners LLC. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Mann, J.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MV3 Partners LLC. (Mann, J.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G. Blake Thompson on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. Attorney G. Blake Thompson added to party MV3 Partners LLC(pty:pla) (Thompson, G.)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy W. Tindel on behalf of MV3 Partners LLC. Attorney Andy W. Tindel added to party MV3 Partners LLC(pty:pla) (Tindel, Andy)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc.. (lad)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MV3 Partners LLC. (Mann, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11585114), filed by MV3 Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MV3 Partners LLC v. Best Buy Stores, LP, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MV3 Partners LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Mann
Represented By: Rodney R. Miller
Represented By: Andy W. Tindel
Represented By: John W. Downing
Represented By: Heather S. Kim
Represented By: Jonathan K. Waldrop
Represented By: Jack Shaw
Represented By: Marcus A. Barber
Represented By: Gurtej Singh
Represented By: Darcy L. Jones
Represented By: G. Blake Thompson
Represented By: Daniel C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, LP
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BestBuy.com, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Texas.com, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?