American Income Life Insurance Company v. Alkurdi
Plaintiff: American Income Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Abdel Alkurdi, Abdel Latif Ahirab Al-Kurdi, Al Alkurdi, Al Kirby and Abdel Al-Kurdi
Case Number: 6:2019cv00016
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Income Life Insurance Company. Abdel Alkurdi served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(McSwain, Andy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Abdel Alkurdi. (mc5)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT Attachment 1 to #1 Complaint by American Income Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McSwain, Andy) Modified on 1/16/2019 (mc5).
January 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Income Life Insurance Company. (McSwain, Andy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Confirmation of Domestic Arbitration Award ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11652164). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Income Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award)(McSwain, Andy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Income Life Insurance Company v. Alkurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdel Alkurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdel Latif Ahirab Al-Kurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Alkurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdel Al-Kurdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Income Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andy McSwain
Represented By: Lauren J. Olivarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?