Mr. Rooter LLC v. MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Rooter LLC
Counter Plaintiff: MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP and MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN
Case Number: 6:2019cv00042
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Stay Case Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunnam, James)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael C. Whitticar for MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN and MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danny Clark Wash for Michael C. Whitticar by on behalf of MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN, MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Wash, Danny)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Michael C. Whitticar. (lad)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN, MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Motion to Stay and Memo in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Wash, Danny)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Danny Clark Wash added to party MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN(pty:dft), Attorney Danny Clark Wash added to party MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Mr. Rooter LLC by MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN, MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wash, Danny)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald A. Giller for Mr. Rooter LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James R. Dunnam on behalf of Ronald A. Giller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11857843) by on behalf of Mr. Rooter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunnam, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to attorney Michael Whitticar advising of admission process and current status. (jgb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mr. Rooter LLC as to All Defendants. (Dunnam, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Dunnam, James)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP. (tb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN. (tb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Dunnam, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 **Sealed - filed in error. JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Dunnam, James) Modified on 2/13/2019 (lad).
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 **Sealed - filed in error. JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Dunnam, James) Modified on 2/13/2019 (lad).
February 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11738673). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Mr. Rooter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunnam, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. Rooter LLC v. MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Rooter LLC
Represented By: James R. Dunnam
Represented By: Ronald A. Giller
Represented By: Andrea Michelle Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: MTCH SERVICE EXPERTS CORP
Represented By: Danny Clark Wash
Represented By: Michael C. Whitticar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: MICHAEL DOUGLAS HORN
Represented By: Danny Clark Wash
Represented By: Michael C. Whitticar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?