Mazanec v. L3 Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jessica Mazanec
Defendant: L3 Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00109
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT AGREED ORDER to #8 MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by L3 Technologies, Inc.. (Palmer, Leslie)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #10 Response to Motion, by Jessica Mazanec. (Bostwick, Frederick)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jessica Mazanec, re #8 MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant L3 Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bostwick, Frederick)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #8 MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by L3 Technologies, Inc.. (Palmer, Leslie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration by L3 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Palmer, Leslie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Leslie A. Palmer, Jr added to party L3 Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) by L3 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Palmer, Leslie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Jessica Mazanec. Jessica Mazanec served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Bostwick, Frederick)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to MARK A. METZGER III. (tb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to L3 Technologies, Inc. (tb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to L3 Technologies, Inc.. (lad)
February 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jessica Mazanec. (Bostwick, Frederick)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11759638), filed by Jessica Mazanec. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bostwick, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazanec v. L3 Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3 Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A. Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mazanec
Represented By: Frederick deB. Bostwick, III
Represented By: Richard E. Brophy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?