Slocum v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gloria K. Slocum
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Supercenter and WAL-MART
Case Number: 6:2019cv00155
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Status Conference held on 4/5/2019. Court reviewed proposed scheduling order. Court stated final pretrial conference shall be 3/26/20 and jury selection and trial 4/13/20. Parties estimate length of trial will be 3 days Court explained his normal trial procedures. Court answered counsel's questions. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint / Agreed by Gloria K. Slocum. (Wash, Danny)
February 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING/STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Ullrich, Rachel)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11767545), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Ullrich, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slocum v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Z. Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Supercenter
Represented By: Rachel Z. Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART
Represented By: Rachel Z. Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria K. Slocum
Represented By: Danny Clark Wash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?