Smarter Agent, LLC v. HomeAway, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Smarter Agent, LLC
Defendant: HomeAway Software, Inc., Glad to Have You, Inc., HomeAway, Inc. and HomeAway.com, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00185
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Glad to Have You, Inc., HomeAway Software, Inc., HomeAway.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Stipulation. Glad to Have You, Inc., HomeAway Software, Inc. and HomeAway.com, Inc. answer due 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE MOVE by Smarter Agent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toler, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smarter Agent, LLC. Glad to Have You, Inc. served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Crocker, Scott)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smarter Agent, LLC. HomeAway Software, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Crocker, Scott)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smarter Agent, LLC. HomeAway.com, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Crocker, Scott)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin R. Johnson for Smarter Agent, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Glad to Have You, Inc. (lad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to HomeAway Software, Inc. (lad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HomeAway.com, Inc. (lad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HomeAway, Inc. (lad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Sherwood Crocker on behalf of Benjamin R Johnson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11842608) by on behalf of Smarter Agent, LLC. (Crocker, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Smarter Agent, LLC. (Crocker, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11835394), filed by Smarter Agent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crocker, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smarter Agent, LLC v. HomeAway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeAway Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glad to Have You, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeAway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeAway.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smarter Agent, LLC
Represented By: Scott Sherwood Crocker
Represented By: Benjamin R. Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Toler
Represented By: Steven Robert Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?