Commstech LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Commstech LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00296
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Louis L. Campbell. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David P. Enzminger. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vivek V. Krishnan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Krishnan Padmanabhan. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex A. Mann for Louis L. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12193880) by on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Mann, Rex)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex A. Mann for Vivek V. Krishnan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12193072) by on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Mann, Rex)
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex A. Mann for David P. Enzminger ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12192181) by on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Mann, Rex)
June 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Cisco Systems, Inc. answer due 7/26/2019. (lad)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The instant Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including July 26, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Mann, Rex)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex A. Mann for Krishnan Padmanabhan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12186127) by on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Mann, Rex)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex A. Mann on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. Attorney Rex A. Mann added to party Cisco Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mann, Rex)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commstech LLC. Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Pace, Melissa)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cole B. Richter for Commstech LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Boyea for Commstech LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (tb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Vanessah Pace for Cole B. Richter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12107601) by on behalf of Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Vanessah Pace for Michael P. Boyea ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12107593) by on behalf of Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jae Y. Pak for Commstech LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean M. Sullivan for Commstech LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc. (lad)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Vanessah Pace for Jae Y. Pak ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12097197) by on behalf of Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Vanessah Pace for Sean M. Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12097164) by on behalf of Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commstech LLC. (Pace, Melissa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12097034), filed by Commstech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pace, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commstech LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commstech LLC
Represented By: Melissa Vanessah Pace
Represented By: Sean M. Sullivan
Represented By: Jae Y. Pak
Represented By: Cole B. Richter
Represented By: Michael P. Boyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Krishnan Padmanabhan
Represented By: Vivek V. Krishnan
Represented By: Louis L. Campbell
Represented By: Rex A. Mann
Represented By: David Enzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?