Gross et al v. Franks

Plaintiff: Jennifer Kidd and Janet Gross
Counter Plaintiff: Floyd Rodney Franks
Case Number: 6:2019cv00308
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RESETTING Initial Pretrial Scheduling and Discovery Telephonic Conference. Set for 7/29/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM against Janet Gross, filed by Floyd Rodney Franks.(Mathews, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Janet Gross, Jennifer Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Braus, Dominic)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Janet Gross, Jennifer Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Amended Complaint). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Braus, Dominic)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dominic Michael Vincent Braus on behalf of Janet Gross, Jennifer Kidd. Attorney Dominic Michael Vincent Braus added to party Jennifer Kidd(pty:pla) (Braus, Dominic)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for Ayesha Rafi in the amount of $100, receipt number 600025051 (lad)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f): initial pretrial scheduling and discovery conference on Wednesday, July 17, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ayesha Rafi for Janet Gross and Jennifer Kidd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AYESHA RAFI for Janet Gross, Jennifer Kidd. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney David Michael Mathews for Floyd Rodney Franks. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Floyd Rodney Franks. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Mathews, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Ayesha Rafi. (lad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Floyd Rodney Franks. (Longacre, Roy)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Floyd Rodney Franks (Received Filing fee $400, Receipt #0542-12129460), filed by Floyd Rodney Franks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Longacre, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross et al v. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Floyd Rodney Franks
Represented By: David Michael Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kidd
Represented By: Ayesha Rafi
Represented By: Dominic Michael Vincent Braus
Represented By: Ryan Alexander Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Gross
Represented By: Ayesha Rafi
Represented By: Dominic Michael Vincent Braus
Represented By: Ryan Alexander Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?