Sayers Construction, LLC v. Timberline Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Defendant: Timberline Construction, Inc. and High Voltage, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00325
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #9 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. As Defendant filed a new motion to dismiss on July 17, 2019, ECF No. 16, the instant motion is moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss by High Voltage, Inc. and Timberline Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the attached Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss into this matter along with the included exhibits. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC, re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant High Voltage, Inc., Defendant Timberline Construction, Inc. (Griffith, Casey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC.(Griffith, Casey)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy C. Ford for High Voltage, Inc. and Timberline Construction, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Edmund Holway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12262564) by on behalf of High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Tim Ford). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter C. Ruggero on behalf of High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc. (Ruggero, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the attached Motion to Dismiss and exhibits into this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by High Voltage, Inc., Timberline Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 MTD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Affidavit of Pratt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Affidavit of Landguth, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Holway, Andrew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek T. Gilliland on behalf of Sayers Construction, LLC. Attorney Derek T. Gilliland added to party Sayers Construction, LLC(pty:pla) (Gilliland, Derek)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate Interim Arbitration Awards by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Barbee Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter Appointing Arbitrator, #4 Exhibit 3 - Arbitrator's Oath, #5 Exhibit 4 - Vento Bio, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ford Bio, #7 Exhibit 6 - Poff Bio, #8 Exhibit 7 - Ford News, #9 Exhibit 8 - HCBA 1, #10 Exhibit 9 - HCBA 2, #11 Exhibit 10 - HCBA 3, #12 Exhibit 11 - HCBA 4, #13 Exhibit 12 - HCBA 5, #14 Exhibit 13 - HCBA Magazine, #15 Exhibit 14 - Hall Bio, #16 Exhibit 15 - Vento Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 16 - WayBack Machine Page, #18 Exhibit 17 - King v. DSE Attorneys, #19 Exhibit 18 - Board Members, #20 Exhibit 19 - Buesing Bio, #21 Exhibit 20 - First Interim Award, #22 Exhibit 21 - AAA Letter, #23 Exhibit 22 - Stipulation of Uncontested Facts, #24 Exhibit 23 - Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #25 Exhibit 24 - Sayers Affidavit Excerpt, #26 Exhibit 25 - Sayers' Proposed Award, #27 Exhibit 26 - Second Interim Award, #28 Exhibit 27 - Legal Fee Claim, #29 Exhibit 28 - Email with Redacted Invoices Excerpt, #30 Exhibit 29 - Sayers Fee Letter, #31 Exhibit 30 - Ford LinkedIn Bio). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Griffith, Casey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Timberline Construction, Inc. (mc5)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to High Voltage, Inc. (mc5)
May 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mc5)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application to Vacate Arbitration Awards ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12157686). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit February 25, 2019 Reasoned Interim Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit May 15, 2019 Second Interim Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit Master Agreement for Contract Services, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffith, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayers Construction, LLC v. Timberline Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberline Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Ruggero
Represented By: Andrew Edmund Holway
Represented By: Timothy C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Voltage, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Ruggero
Represented By: Andrew Edmund Holway
Represented By: Timothy C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Derek T. Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?