Valles et al v. I.C. Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Finley, Erica Leibensperger, Marcus Falco, Edwenia Sadler and Dora Valles
Defendant: I.C. Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00348
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Initial pretrial conference set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by I.C. Systems, Inc..(Malone, Robbie)
July 1, 2019 Reset Deadlines: I.C. Systems, Inc. answer due 7/18/2019. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have until July 18, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties by I.C. Systems, Inc.. (Malone, Robbie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by I.C. Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Malone, Robbie)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Finley, Marcus Falco, Edwenia Sadler, Dora Valles, Erica Leibensperger. I.C. Systems, Inc. served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hughes, W.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to I.C. Systems, Inc. (lad)
June 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Marcus Falco, James Finley, Erica Leibensperger, Edwenia Sadler, Dora Valles. (Hughes, W.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marcus Falco, James Finley, Erica Leibensperger, Edwenia Sadler, Dora Valles. (Hughes, W.)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12180774), filed by James Finley, Marcus Falco, Edwenia Sadler, Dora Valles, Erica Leibensperger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valles et al v. I.C. Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Finley
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett Lee Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Leibensperger
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett Lee Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Falco
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett Lee Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwenia Sadler
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett Lee Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Valles
Represented By: Bryant A. Fitts
Represented By: W. Craft Hughes
Represented By: Jarrett Lee Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Michael Bach
Represented By: Robbie Malone
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?