Maldonado v. Davis

Petitioner: Catrina Maldonado
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Case Number: 6:2019cv00368
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case Opening Letter re Transfer from another District. (Attachments: #1 Pro-Se Filers Privacy Policy)(lad)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 4:19-cv-00430.
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. It is accordingly ORDERED Petitioner's case is TRANSFERRED to the Waco Division of the Western District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/12/2019. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/13/2019.]
June 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/13/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/13/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Catrina Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Catrina Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?