Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00385
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 10/1/2019. (lad)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration Defendants' Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants shall have until October 1, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint and Waiver of Foreign Service Requirement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL by Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Healy, Andres)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andres Healy for Ancora Technologies, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lexie G. White on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Lexie G. White added to party Ancora Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (White, Lexie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles L. Ainsworth on Behalf of Andres Healy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12277352) by on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (td)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (td)
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (td)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Ancora Technologies, Inc.. Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt added to party Ancora Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bunt, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12263631), filed by Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Lexie G. White
Represented By: Andres Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?