Neodron, Ltd. v. HP Inc.

Plaintiff: Neodron, Ltd.
Defendant: HP Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00397
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by HP Inc..(Guaragna, John)
August 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: HP Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. (lad)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Knudson for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Williams for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik R. Fuehrer for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean C. Cunningham for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, Defendant HP Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED until Friday, August 23, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant David R. Knudson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442739) by on behalf of HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Robert Williams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442545) by on behalf of HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Erik R. Fuehrer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442443) by on behalf of HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Applicant Erin P. Gibson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442339) by on behalf of HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna by Applicant Sean C. Cunningham ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442182) by on behalf of HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K. Erickson on behalf of HP Inc.. Attorney Brian K. Erickson added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (Erickson, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of Neodron, Ltd.. Attorney Kristopher R. Davis added to party Neodron, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Davis, Kristopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
July 12, 2019 Notice of Correction: re 7 Acknowledgment of Service was changed to Summons Returned Executed to reflect accurate answer date of 7/24/19 instead of 8/2/19. (am)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neodron, Ltd.. HP Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (am)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Neodron, Ltd.. HP Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HP Inc. (lad)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Neodron, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295040), filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neodron, Ltd. v. HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Robert Williams
Represented By: Erin P. Gibson
Represented By: Sean C. Cunningham
Represented By: David R. Knudson
Represented By: Erik R. Fuehrer
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neodron, Ltd.
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Kristopher R. Davis
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?